Iniguez et al v. Vantium Capital Inc et al
Plaintiff: Stewart Iniguez and Sherrill Iniguez
Defendant: Registration Systems, Inc, Vantium Capital Inc, CitiMortgage, Inc., Mortgage Master, Inc., Quality Loan Service Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. and First American Title Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00037
Filed: January 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND by Judge William Alsup [granting 23 Motion to Remand; finding as moot 18 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss\. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE REGARDING DOCKET NUMBER 50 [re 50 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Sherrill Iniguez, Stewart Iniguez]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/27/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO AMEND, AND DENYING REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS [re 23 MOTION to Remand filed by Sherrill Iniguez, Stewart Iniguez]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/25/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE RE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS re 25 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Sherrill Iniguez, Stewart Iniguez (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iniguez et al v. Vantium Capital Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Registration Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantium Capital Inc
Represented By: Paul Nathan Tauger
Represented By: Elhum Navid
Represented By: Deborah May Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Represented By: Shohrah Shuray Ghorishi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Master, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah May Bass
Represented By: Elhum Navid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Represented By: Deborah May Bass
Represented By: Elhum Navid
Represented By: Paul Nathan Tauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Company
Represented By: Brian Charles Carter
Represented By: Matisse M. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart Iniguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrill Iniguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?