Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The v. Ashbury General Contracting and Engineering et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The
Defendant: John Kim, Kevin Born, Ashbury General Contracting and Engineering, Nicole Hinton-Born, Ashbury Builders, Inc., Ashbury Homes, Inc., Ashbury Quality Construction and Kin Michelle Dea
Case Number: 3:2013cv00060
Filed: January 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/16/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/2/14. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/5/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/20/2014 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 2/18/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/22/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2014 09:00 AM.; Jury Selection set for 3/24/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 3/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The v. Ashbury General Contracting and Engineering et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Born
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashbury General Contracting and Engineering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Hinton-Born
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashbury Builders, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashbury Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashbury Quality Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kin Michelle Dea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Daniel Carson Welch
Represented By: James D. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?