Frank v. County of Humboldt et al
Plaintiff: Minny Frank
Defendant: James Bragg, Christy Reihm, Katherine Young, Keri Schrock, Jeri Scardini, Asha George, Angela Monson, Paul Hyppolite, Chris Starets-Foote, Donna Wheeler, County of Humboldt, County of Humboldt Department of Health and Human Services, Shelley Nilsen, David Williams, Jennifer Williams and BHC Sierra Vista Hospital
Case Number: 3:2013cv00089
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 20, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL re 187 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 11, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: IDENTIFICATION, NONUSE AND RETURN AND/OR CONFIRMED DESTRUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SUBJECT TO THE HEALTH INSURANCE PORTABILITY AND ACCOUNTABILITY ("HIPAA") PROTECTIONS AND PRIVILEGED UNDER CALIFORNIA EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 1157 AND EXHIBIT A - C. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 22, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ABDUL QADIR'S MOTION TO STRIKE; VACATING MAY 9, 2014 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 25, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 149 Motion for Reconsideration re 147 Order on Motions to Compel.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte denying 111 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion to Compel; denying 114 Motion to Compel; denying 115 Motion to Compel; denying 126 Motion to Compel (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ADD PARTY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 10, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER VACATING MARCH 7, 2014 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ADD PARTY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 5, 2014. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF COUNTY DEFENDANTS DONNA WHEELER, ANGELA MONSON, SHELLEY NILSEN, ASHA GEORGE, CHRIS STARETS-FOOTE AND JERI SCARDINI. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte terminating 73 Discovery Letter Brief; terminating 74 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document; granting 77 Discovery Letter Brief (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/3/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTERS AND ACCOMPANYING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT ABDUL QADIR TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURTS STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 11, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS DAVID WILLIAMS AND JENNIFER WILLIAMS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 22, 2013. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. For plaintiff's motion to amend: (1) Defendants' opposition(s), if any, shall be filed no later than May 17, 2013. (2) Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be filed no later than May 24, 2013. (3) The hearing is hereby scheduled for June 14, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. The hearings on the pending motions to dismiss are continued to June 14, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 3, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC SERVICES. The motion is denied as moot, the April 12, 2013 Case Management Conference having been continued to July 17, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 4, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The haring on the motion to dismiss is continued to May 17, 2013. The Case Management Conference is continued to July 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 3, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank v. County of Humboldt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bragg
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Reihm
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Young
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keri Schrock
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri Scardini
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asha George
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Monson
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hyppolite
Represented By: Genese Kay Dopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Starets-Foote
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Wheeler
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Humboldt
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Humboldt Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Nilsen
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHC Sierra Vista Hospital
Represented By: Genese Kay Dopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minny Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?