Schmidt et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: James M. Schmidt and Robert M. Schmidt
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company and JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00098
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/17/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/18/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/25/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/15/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FINDING CASES NOT RELATED. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 03/12/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUA SPONTE ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/7/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/5/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?