Zamora et al v. Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: Marcos Zamora and Marcy Zamora
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 3:2013cv00134
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 30 Motion to Vacate (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT MOTION HEARING re 35 Proposed Order filed by Marcos Zamora. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/29/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/5/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/15/2013 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/1/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/24/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 4 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend within 20 days. To filed an amended complaint, Plaintiffs must overcome (1) the fact that they made monthly payments in amounts that fluctuated in accordance wit h the adjustable interest rate terms in the Note for more than six years before defaulting on their loan, and (2) the fact that Plaintiffs had access to papers disclosing the loan terms at the inception of the loan. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER VACATING HEARING RE: MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/16/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/25/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/4/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamora et al v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Zamora
Represented By: Laura Ann Furuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcy Zamora
Represented By: Laura Ann Furuta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Adam Frederick Summerfield
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?