Torres v. Compass Group USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary George Torres
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00179
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 STIPULATION to Dismiss Action with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/6/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO CONDUCT ENE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/27/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/3/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Compass Group USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary George Torres
Represented By: Beth A. Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Francis J. Ortman, III
Represented By: Justin Taylor Curley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?