Tse v. Google Inc., et al. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Ho Keung Tse
Defendant: Google Inc, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC and HTC America Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv00194
Filed: January 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/14/13. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 14, 2013 Filing 54 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:12-cv-00356. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2013: # 2 Transfer In) (gaS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2013 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mjc, )
January 7, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE by Ho Keung TSE of No Appeal Against the Order to Transfer this Case to Northern District of California (TSE, Ho Keung)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 32 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Google Inc., and transferring this case to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/12/12. (mjc, )
December 10, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE by Ho Keung TSE of Issuance of a Certificate of Correction by the Patent Office (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- A Certificate of Correction issued by the Patent Office)(TSE, Ho Keung)
December 4, 2012 Filing 50 CORRECTED NOTICE by Ho Keung TSE of Withdrawal of Request for Certificate of Correction filed with the Patent Office (Dkt. 49 re-filed to include Certificate of Service) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A- Reexamination Certificate, # 3 Exhibit B- Plaintiffs Letter for Withdrawing a Request for Certificate of Correction Filed With the Patent Office)(TSE, Ho Keung) Modified on 12/5/2012 (sm, ).
December 3, 2012 Filing 49 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 50 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** NOTICE by Ho Keung TSE of Withdrawal of Request for Certificate of Correction filed with the Patent Office (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Reexamination Certificate, # 2 Exhibit B- Plaintiffs letter for withdrawing a request for certificate of correction filed with the patent office)(TSE, Ho Keung) Modified on 12/6/2012 (gsg).
November 14, 2012 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 11/14/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (rlf)
November 14, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Guaragna on behalf of Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Guaragna, John)
November 1, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/14/2012 10:30 AM is moved to 01:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (cwk)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER setting Status Conference for 11/14/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/16/12. cc:attys 10-17-12(mll, )
September 18, 2012 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re 40 MOTION to Sever and Stay or, in the Alternative, Join in Google's Motion to Transfer filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Fountain, Aaron)
September 18, 2012 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Fountain, Aaron)
September 17, 2012 Filing 43 "COURT ENTRY FOR TESTING PURPOSES ONLY RE: CM/ECF ERROR MESSAGE ON NOTICE EVENT, PLEASE IGNORE" Modified on 9/17/2012 (rvw, ).
September 8, 2012 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 MOTION to Sever and Stay or, in the Alternative, Join in Google's Motion to Transfer filed by Ho Keung TSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(TSE, Ho Keung)
September 8, 2012 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ho Keung TSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(TSE, Ho Keung)
August 23, 2012 Filing 40 MOTION to Sever and Stay or, in the Alternative, Join in Google's Motion to Transfer by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Botello Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fountain, Aaron)
August 23, 2012 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Deepak Gupta, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
August 23, 2012 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fountain, Aaron)
August 14, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE that this case is ready for Scheduling Conference by Ho Keung TSE (mll, )
August 14, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE of Issuance of Reexamination Certificate by Ho Keung TSE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(mll, )
August 14, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing Form AO 120 by Ho Keung TSE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(mll, )
August 13, 2012 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Ho Keung TSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(TSE, Ho Keung)
July 30, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE by HTC America Inc re 32 MOTION to Change Venue Notice of Joinder in Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Selinger, Jerry)
July 25, 2012 Filing 32 MOTION to Change Venue by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Ong, # 2 Declaration of Deepak Gupta, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 24, 2012 Filing 31 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Ho Keung TSE by Google Inc. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 23, 2012 Filing 30 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Stay filed by Ho Keung TSE. (TSE, Ho Keung)
July 20, 2012 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Stay filed by HTC America Inc. (Selinger, Jerry)
July 19, 2012 Filing 28 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephanie Powers Skaff for Google Inc.(pkb, )
July 19, 2012 Filing 27 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Deepak Gupta for Google Inc. (pkb, )
July 19, 2012 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Elizabeth Powley on behalf of HTC America Inc (Powley, Susan)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Answer. Samsung has leave to file a late Answer, and the Answer will be deemed to have been filed as of the original date of its filing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/19/12. cc:pltf & dfts 7-19-12 (mll, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Set Aside Default. The Clerks Entry of Default as to Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC is hereby set aside and withdrawn. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/19/12. cc:pltf & dfts 7-19-12 (mll, )
July 16, 2012 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Late Answer by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
July 16, 2012 Filing 22 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC.(Erickson, Brian)
July 16, 2012 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Default by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
July 13, 2012 Filing 20 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC.(Erickson, Brian)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Allow Plaintiff to File Electronically. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/11/12. cc:pltf & dfts 7-11-12 (mll, )
July 11, 2012 Filing 18 ***SET ASIDE AND WITHDRAWN PER 24 ORDER*** Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (mll, ) Modified on 7/19/2012 (mll, ).
July 10, 2012 Filing 17 Request by Ho Keung TSE for Clerk's Entry of Default against Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (mll, )
July 10, 2012 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Stay filed by Ho Keung TSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(mll, )
July 10, 2012 Filing 15 ANSWER to 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Ho Keung TSE.(mll, )
July 10, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Collateral Proceeding 4:12cv328 by Ho Keung TSE (mll, )
July 10, 2012 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC on 6/8/2012, by personal service; answer due: 6/29/2012. (mll, )
July 10, 2012 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to HTC America Inc on 6/5/2012, by personal service. (mll, )
July 10, 2012 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Google Inc on 6/4/2012, by personal service. (mll, )
July 2, 2012 Filing 10 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Ho Keung TSE by Google Inc.(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 25, 2012 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HTC America Inc identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for HTC America Inc. (Selinger, Jerry)
June 25, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Stay by HTC America Inc. Responses due by 7/12/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Selinger, Jerry)
June 25, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry Robin Selinger on behalf of HTC America Inc (Selinger, Jerry)
June 22, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 3 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc to 7/2/2012. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
June 18, 2012 Filing 3 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc.( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 15, 2012 Filing 5 (Hard Copy) Original Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Cover Letter & Envelopes) (Originally filed electronically as document # 1 Complaint)(mll, )
June 15, 2012 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to file documents electronically by Ho Keung TSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(mll, )
May 30, 2012 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Google Inc, HTC America Inc, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
May 30, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
May 30, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3611342.), filed by Ho Keung TSE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A-US Patent 6665797, # 3 Exhibit B-Notice of Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate, # 4 Exhibit C-Final State of Claims)(Keung TSE, Ho)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tse v. Google Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America LLC
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: Aaron Gabriel Fountain
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Powley
Represented By: Jerry Robin Selinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ho Keung Tse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?