Viens et al v. HowMedica Osteonics Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Viens and Sandra Viens
Defendant: HowMedica Osteonics Corp.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00262
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of Minnesota; new case no. 13-cv-1446. In Re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2441.(gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013) (Entered: 06/12/2013) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING BY MDL PANEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/22/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING re 8 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by HowMedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Sales Corporation, Stryker Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/28/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viens et al v. HowMedica Osteonics Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Viens
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Viens
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HowMedica Osteonics Corp.
Represented By: Wayne Allen Wolff
Represented By: Arameh Zargham O'Boyle
Represented By: Rafael A. Campillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?