Prime 3 Group, LLC v. SolFocus, Inc.
Plaintiff: Prime 3 Group, LLC
Defendant: SolFocus, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00264
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/20/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 19 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Prime 3 Group, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/19/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT 8 WITHOUT PREJUDICE; GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; VACATING APRIL 25, 2013 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/10/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime 3 Group, LLC v. SolFocus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime 3 Group, LLC
Represented By: Brian Ted Hafter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolFocus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?