Hill v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Hill
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00276
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 16 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CMC filed by Veronica Hill. Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2013. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 3/6/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Hill
Represented By: Alice Jacoby Wolfson
Represented By: David D Lilienstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas Scullion
Represented By: Seth John Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth John Manfredi
Represented By: Douglas Scullion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?