Chan v. Booska et al
Plaintiff: Tracy N. Chan
Defendant: Hidden Oak Group, Inc. and Steven A. Booska
Case Number: 3:2013cv00291
Filed: January 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/3/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/25/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/13/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chan v. Booska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hidden Oak Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Booska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy N. Chan
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?