Purple Leaf LLC v. Zuora Inc.
Plaintiff: Purple Leaf LLC
Defendant: Zuora Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00299
Filed: January 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Motions terminated: 42 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes and Ex Parte Reexaminations filed by Zuora Inc. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/18/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FURTHER STIPULATION AND ORDER CONFIRMING OPPOSITION AND REPLY DUE DATES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/8/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 45 SECOND STIPULATION CONTINUING DATE OF HEARING ON ZUORA'S MOTION TO STAY. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/24/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 43 CONTINUING DATE OF HEARING ON ZOURA'S MOTION TO STAY. Motion Hearing continued to 4/17/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, LIFTING THE STIPULATED STAY OF PROCEEDINGS, AND PROVIDING DIRECTIONS AS TO MOTION FOR STAY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/15/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF STIPULATED STAY AND VACATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/16/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. The case will be voluntarily stayed, and the parties shall submit to the Court a joint status report every 120 days during the pendency of the stay. Signed by Judge RICHARD SEEBORG on 06/10/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purple Leaf LLC v. Zuora Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zuora Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purple Leaf LLC
Represented By: Jesse Frank Ruiz
Represented By: Archie Stirling Robinson
Represented By: Gabriel G. Gregg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?