Dhawan v. Broadway Partners Fund Manager, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Lovleen Dhawan
Defendant: Broadway Partners Fund Manager, L.L.C., Rockefeller Group Development Corporation, Chaudel Baker and Broadway Real Estate Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00336
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 26 Motion to Remand; finding as moot 41 Motion to Strike; finding as moot 42 Motion to Strike (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 36 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Rockefeller Group Development Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/5/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/8/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dhawan v. Broadway Partners Fund Manager, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Partners Fund Manager, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jacqueline C deSouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockefeller Group Development Corporation
Represented By: L. Julius M. Turman
Represented By: Sacha Marie Steenhoek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaudel Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Real Estate Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lovleen Dhawan
Represented By: Suzy C. Moore
Represented By: Frank Scott Moore
Represented By: Frank Christian Liuzzi
Represented By: Michael Eric Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?