Asetek Holdings, Inc et al v. Cooler Master Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Asetek Holdings, Inc and Asetek A/S
Defendant: Cooler Master Co., Ltd. and Cooler Master USA Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv00457
Filed: January 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 397 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 396 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulated Request and Proposed Order to Stay Proceedings Pending Consummation of Settlement Agreement filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 394 Joint Stipulation to Modify Case Schedule; Declaration of Lily Lim in Support Thereof; [Proposed] Order filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Discovery cutoff 8/25/2017. Motion for Injunction due 9/14/2017. Responses due 10/12/2017. Replies due 10/26/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 31, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 392 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 391 Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to Modify Case Schedule; Declaration of Lily Lim in Support Thereof; Proposed Order filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 390 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Modify Case Schedule; Supporting Declaration; Proposed Order filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 22, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 388 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 387 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Regarding Disbursement and Proposed Order filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 9, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 380 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 24, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 371 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 370 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 361 Clerk's Notice, Joint Case Management Statement and Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference; Proposed Order filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Status Report due by 3/1/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE AND DENYING MOTION TO SUSPEND INJUNCTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 349 Motion to Intervene; denying Motion Suspend Injunction. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 349 MOTION to Intervene and to Suspend Injunction filed by Cooler Master Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 30, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 351 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re 349 MOTION to Intervene and to Suspend Injunction; -Joint Stipulated Request to Amend Briefing Schedule filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 10, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER re 338 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Joint Stipulation to Approve Bond and to Stay Execution of Judgment through Appeal Pursuant to FRCP 62; [Proposed] Order filed by CMI USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 326 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 14, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S POST-TRIAL MOTIONS; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S POST-TRIAL MOTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 266 Motion for Permanent Injunction; granting in part and denying in part 267 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 269 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 309 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs DEFENDANT CMI USA, INC.S MOTION TO REVIEW CLERKS DECISION NOT TO TAX COSTS UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(b)(4)(E) filed by CMI USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 24, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED FORM OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION re 313 Objection, filed by CMI USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 18, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part 289 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPROVE PROPOSED JUDGMENT AS TO FORM OR TO FILE OBJECTIONS re 253 Proposed Order, filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 12, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER re 254 Notice of Change In Counsel; Request Pursuant to Local Rule 11-5 for an Order Permitting Withdrawal of Counsel and [Proposed] Order filed by CMI USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 4, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; ORDER ENTERING JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO SEAL TRIAL EXHIBITS AND TRANSCRIPTS, AND TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS FROM THE DOCKET by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT AS TO ASETEK'S CLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTORY INFRINGEMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 12, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 226 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Requesting Telephonic Conference; filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2015 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 6, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER REGARDING RETENTION OF EXHIBITS AND RETRIEVAL OF TRIAL MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 22, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER DIRECTING JURY COMMISSIONER TO FURNISH LUNCH DURING DELIBERATION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 17, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER ADOPTING ASETEK'S PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS 25 AND 27 re 205 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OUTSIDE THE SCOPE OF DR. CARMAN'S EXPERT REPORT re 196 Brief, filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 9, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 185 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Joint Stipulation Requesting Order to Permit Entry of Equipment and Materials Into Court; [Proposed] Order filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 26, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 150 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER -JOINT STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE FILING DATE OF JURY VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS, PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND PROPOSED JURY VERDICT FORMS BY ONE DAY filed by CMI USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulated Request to Continue Filing Date of Motions in limine by One Day filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 PRETRIAL ORDER RE JURY ISSUES. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER; Stipulated Request for Order re Materials for Hearing; Proposed Order filed by Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 15, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE DEFENDANT CMI USA, INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF (1) INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,240,362 AND 8,245,764; AND (2) NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,240,362 filed by CMI USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 26, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 92 MOTION to Exclude Testimony Plaintiffs Asetek Holdings, Inc.'s and Asetek A/S's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Defendant CMI USA, Inc.'s Expert Gregory P. Carman filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 11, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Dismissal and Proposed Order filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 5, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' JOINT LETTER re 77 Letter, filed by Cooler Master USA Inc, Cooler Master Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SCHEDULING ORDER re 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order Following Telephonic Conference With Court; Proposed Order filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 27, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Expert Discovery Deadline filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 24, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT AND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND TO AMEND CASE CAPTION re 60 Letter Brief filed by Asetek Holdings, Inc, Asetek A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY ACTION AS TO '764 PATENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 40 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER; Stipulated Request for Order Granting Extension of Time to Complete Alternative Dispute Resolution filed by Cooler Master USA Inc, Cooler Master Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 13, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Re Claim Construction for Asetek's Patents. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 30 Order to Show Cause. Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT IMPOSE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT. Show Cause Response due by 10/24/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/31/2013 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 15, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASE. CASES ARE NOT RELATED.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/26/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asetek Holdings, Inc et al v. Cooler Master Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asetek Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Tina E. Hulse
Represented By: Robert Francis McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asetek A/S
Represented By: Tina E. Hulse
Represented By: Robert Francis McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooler Master Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooler Master USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?