Ford et al v. Munks et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ford and Denise Ford
Defendant: Penninsula Corridor Joint Powers Board, Greg Munks and Zaidi
Case Number: 3:2013cv00532
Filed: February 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY AT TRIAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 51 Motion to Strike 51 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Report and Preclusion of Roger Clark from Testifying in Plaintiffs' Case-in-Chief.(whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING re 48 Letter filed by Greg Munks, Michael Baron, Zaidi Motions due by 3/21/2014. Responses due by 3/26/2014. Replies due by 3/28/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/18/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE RE 41 Letter filed by Denise Ford, Jeremy Ford, 42 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents filed by Denise Ford, Jeremy Ford. Response due by NOON ON March 12, 2014. 3-Hour meet-and-confer from 10:00 AM -- 1:00 PM 3/13/2014 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 3/13/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/10/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup denying 23 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS re 23 Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Denise Ford, Jeremy Ford, 30 Order Signed by Judge William Alsup on November 14, 2013. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REQUEST TO SHOW CAUSE 23 Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Denise Ford, Jeremy Ford. Signed by Judge William Alsup on October 30, 2013. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE REGARDING UPCOMING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/21/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 15 Letter filed by Greg Munks, Zaidi]. Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/17/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER VACATING CMC. Status Report due by 5/23/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/6/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford et al v. Munks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penninsula Corridor Joint Powers Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Munks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ford
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Ford
Represented By: DeWitt Marcellus Lacy
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?