Cruz v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff: Miriam Cruz
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00543
Filed: February 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONDITIONAL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. IN RE: MIRENA IUD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITGATION. MDL No. 2434. To the United States District Court, Southern District of New York. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/24/13. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. The hearing on defendant's motion is continued to April 26, 2013. Plaintiff's motion to stay is deemed withdrawn without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 9 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 27, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Cruz
Represented By: Timothy J. Becker
Represented By: Rolf T. Fiebiger
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Michael K. Johnson
Represented By: Karen Lee Karavatos
Represented By: Shannon Marie Lukei
Represented By: Daniel Stewart Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Alicia J. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?