Skinner v. Mountain Lion Acquisition, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Alicia G. Skinner
Defendant: Mountain Lion Acquisition, Inc, Judith East, D. Scott Carruthers, A Professional Law Corporation and Dennis Scott Carruthers
Case Number: 3:2013cv00704
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins Re: Dkt. Nos. 90, 91 (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying 68 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DOCUMENT ENTERED IN WRONG CASE - PLEASE DISREGARD(jjoS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SKINNER'S COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND RE: 35 47 . Any amended complaint must be filed within twenty-eight days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY RE: 56 58 . Further Case Management Conference set with the motion for protective order on 1/29/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/17/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING Request to Appear Telephonically 25 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/17/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skinner v. Mountain Lion Acquisition, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia G. Skinner
Represented By: Anna Claire Johnson
Represented By: Raeon Rodrigo Roulston
Represented By: Kari Annette Rudd
Represented By: Fred W. Schwinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Lion Acquisition, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Scott Carruthers, A Professional Law Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Scott Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?