Lindberg v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Heddi Lindberg
Defendant: Regional Trustee Services Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00808
Filed: February 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: 14-cv-2544. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/9/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion for Attorney Fees (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/19/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 42 Ex Parte Application (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 15 Motion to Dismiss; denying 28 Motion to Remand (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/8/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/1/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindberg v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Trustee Services Corporation
Represented By: Robin Prema Wright
Represented By: Nicole Kimberly Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Franklin
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heddi Lindberg
Represented By: Vernon L. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?