Navarro v. Ordaz Cultured Marble & Onyx, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rafael Navarro
Defendant: Ordaz Cultured Marble & Onyx, Inc. and Francisco Ordaz
Case Number: 3:2013cv00847
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER APPROVING THE PAGA PENALTY IN THE PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/23/2015.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING THIS ACTION. The Clerk is instructed to administratively close this action. The parties nevertheless shall file a dismissal of this action that complies with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) by February 27, 2015. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/13/2015. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED ORDER AMENDING THE CASE MANAGEMENT DATES AND DEADLINES. This amended order makes clear that the last day for hearing dispostive motions is now December 18, 2014. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/3/2014. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CONTINUING CMC AND REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT CMC STATEMENT BY JUNE 26, 2014. The court CONTINUES the June 19 Further CMC to 11:00 a.m. on July 3, 2014. The court once again ORDERS the parties to file a joint CMC statement that including a chart with new trial deadlines. The parties shall do so by June 26, 2014. Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/13/2014. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/31/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Re 34 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Ordaz Cultured Marble & Onyx, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/16/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry on ECF within 7 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/19/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED Case Management and Pretrial Order (Jury). The court issues this amended order only to make clear that the non-expert discovery completion date and the date that expert disclosures are required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is December 19, 2013, not 2014 as the original order (ECF No. 14 ) stated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/12/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarro v. Ordaz Cultured Marble & Onyx, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Navarro
Represented By: Stanley Scott Mallison
Represented By: Hector R. Martinez
Represented By: Marco A Palau
Represented By: Joseph Donald Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ordaz Cultured Marble & Onyx, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Ordaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?