Wetherell v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Patty M. Wetherell
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2013cv00889
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on 12 defendant's motion to dismiss: No later than May 6, 2013, plaintiff shall file any opposition; no later than May 13, 2013, defendant shall file any reply; the hearing on the matter is May 24, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 17, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 3, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S 11 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wetherell v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Timothy R. Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty M. Wetherell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?