SunMan Engineering, Inc. v. Arnouse Digital Devices Corporation, Inc.
Petitioner: SunMan Engineering, Inc.
Respondent: Arnouse Digital Devices Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00897
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 97 Stipulation filed by SunMan Engineering, Inc.. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 6/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 re Hearing Date and Briefing Schedules to Cross-Motions to Confirm and to Vacate, Correct, Modify, or Clarify Arbitration Award filed by Arnouse Digital Devices Corporation, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Hearing Date and Briefing Schedules to Cross-Motions to Confirm and to Vacate, Correct, Modify, or Clarify Arbitration Award, 14 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and For Entry of Judgment. Responses due by 4/18/2013. Replies due by 5/2/2013. Plaintiff's reply: 5/10/13. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/5/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 3/27/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/13/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SunMan Engineering, Inc. v. Arnouse Digital Devices Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SunMan Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Katja M Grasso
Represented By: Ali Kamarei
Represented By: George William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arnouse Digital Devices Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn M. Ceizler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?