Broughton v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Rachelle Broughton
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00966
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 20, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RECUSAL ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
June 3, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/3/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
September 12, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/12/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broughton v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle Broughton
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin A. Cornell
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.