D'Alessio et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Jason Fisher, Chan C. Pharn, Joseph Midgette, Richard D'Alessio, Michael Lerner and Kathy Lerner
Defendant: Wachovia Bank, FSB, Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, World Savings Bank, FSB, Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, Wachovia Corporation, Golden West Financial Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and World Savings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00999
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting briefing schedule.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/15/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING re 3 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal; filed by Jason Fisher, Michael Lerner, Chan C. Pharn, Richard D'Alessio, Joseph Midgette, Kathy Lerner. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/5/13. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Alessio et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Bank, FSB
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Jonathan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Jonathan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Jonathan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage, FSB
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Jonathan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Corporation
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Jonathan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden West Financial Corporation
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Jonathan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jeremy E Shulman
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Jonathan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Jonathan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Levi Sanders
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Robert T. Mowrey
Represented By: Jonathan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Fisher
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chan C. Pharn
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Midgette
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D'Alessio
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lerner
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Lerner
Represented By: Lee A. Weiss
Represented By: Jeffrey K Berns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?