Bernstein v. Target Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Leonard Bernstein, IV
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc., John Doe 1-50, Mary Roe 1-50, XYZ Corp 1-50, ABC LLC 1-50 and The Names of John Doe 1-50 Mary Roe 1-50, XYZ Corp, 1-50 and ABC LLC, 1-50
Case Number: 3:2013cv01018
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PER PARTIES' SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/15/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/4/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 42 Motion to Reopen Case (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/6/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO REFILE MOTION. Plaintiff must refile his motion for leave to amend the complaint and notice the motion for hearing. The deadlines for response and reply in connection with docket entry 26 are vacated. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/23/2013. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernstein v. Target Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Leonard Bernstein, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC LLC 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Names of John Doe 1-50 Mary Roe 1-50, XYZ Corp, 1-50 and ABC LLC, 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?