St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company v. American Safety Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Golden Bear Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Maryland Casualty Company, Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Nautilus Insurance Company, Northern Insurance Company of New York, Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG, a Risk Retention Group, Scottsdale Insurance Company, United National Insurance Company and Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv01082
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER (30-day conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/16/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER re 185 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE TRIAL DATE filed by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Status Report due by 9/30/2015. Status Conference reset for 10/8/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Status Report due by 10/8/2015. Status Conference reset for 10/15/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/1/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 180 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS NAUTILUS INSURANCE CO. filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 177 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK filed by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 171 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 160 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Voluntarily Dismiss American Safety Indemnity Company filed by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER RESETTING STATUS FROM 3/26/15 to 5/7/15 at 10:30 a.m. re 157 Status Report filed by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company Status Report due by 4/30/2015. Status Conference set for 5/7/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/24/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER resetting status. Status Report due by 3/19/2015. Status Conference reset for 3/26/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/16/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 143 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Voluntarily Dismiss ProBuilders filed by Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG, a Risk Retention Group. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO NATIONAL UNION ONLY re 140 Stipulation filed by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, Motions terminated: 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 127 Stipulation filed by STRS Ohio CA Real Estate Investment I LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/30/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 95 Stipulation filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION to Extend time for Aspen Specialty Insurance Company Time to File a Responsive Pleading filed by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/29/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company v. American Safety Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Daniel Eli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Ronald D. Echeguren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Bear Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew B. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Elisabeth Marie DAgostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG, a Risk Retention Group
Represented By: Michele Olive Blais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?