April 14, 2014 |
Filing
51
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 14, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
|
February 4, 2014 |
Filing
49
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties having advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement of this cause, it is ordered that plaintiffs' claims alleged against defendants herein be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, tha t if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety (90) days, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings as appropriate. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
|
January 22, 2014 |
Filing
47
ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. The date by which defendants must respond to the Fourth Amended Complaint is extended from January 22, 2014 to February 21, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
|
December 20, 2013 |
Filing
44
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS SECTION 52.1 CLAIM; EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. The deadline for plaintiffs to file a Fourth Amended Complaint is extended to January 8, 2014. Signed By Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 20, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
|
December 3, 2013 |
Filing
41
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING. The Third Cause of Action, to the extent it is based on a Fourth Amendment violation, is dismissed without leave to amend. The Fourth Cause of Action, to the extent alleged against Sgt. Bias, is dismissed without leave to amend. The Fifth Cause of Action is dismissed with leave to amend. The Seventh Cause of Action, to the extent it is based on a claim of dire ct negligence as alleged against the City, is dismissed without leave to amend. In all other respects, the motion to dismiss is denied. If plaintiffs wish to file a Fourth Amended Complaint for purposes of amending the Fifth Cause of Action, any such Fourth Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than December 20, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
|
November 22, 2013 |
Filing
39
PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/22/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
|
September 25, 2013 |
Filing
29
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Third, Fifth, Seventh, Eighth, Ninth, and Eleventh Causes of Action are dismissed in their entirety. The First, Sixth, and Tenth Causes of Action are dismissed to the extent they are alleged against Sgt. Bias. The Second Cause of Action is dismissed to the extent it is alleged on behalf of Moya and to the extent it is alleged agai nst Sgt. Bias. If plaintiffs wish to file a Third Amended Complaint for purposes of curing any or all of the deficiencies, any such Third Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than October 18, 2013. If plaintiffs do not file a Third Amended Comp laint within the time provided, the instant action will proceed on the remaining claims in the Second Amended Complaint. The Case Management Conference, currently scheduled for October 25, 2013, is continued to November 8, 2013, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than November 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 25, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
|
September 24, 2013 |
Filing
28
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 24, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
|
September 6, 2013 |
Filing
27
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO OCTOBER 25, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 6, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
|
July 11, 2013 |
Filing
20
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; GRANTING LEAVE FOR THE FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DEEMING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISM ISS WITHDRAWN, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss, currently set for July 26, 2013, is vacated, leave is granted for plaintiffs to file a Second Amended Complaint by August 1, 2013, with a rseponsive pleading du e 21 days thereafter, and the Case Management Conference is continued from July 19, 2013 to September 13, 2013. Defendants' motion to dismiss is deemed withdrawn, without prejudice to refiling in the event plaintiffs do not file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
|
June 4, 2013 |
Filing
17
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO VACATE AND RE-SET INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ADR DEADLINES, AND RULE 26(f) REPORT & INITIAL DISCLOSURES TIMELINE. The Initial Case Management Conference, set for June 14, 2013, is vacated and re-set to July 19, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. The ADR Deadlines and Rule 26(f) disclosures and Report timeline are continued accordingly. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 4, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
|
June 3, 2013 |
Filing
16
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 3, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
|