AOptix Technologies v. Blue Spike, LLC

Plaintiff: AOptix Technologies
Defendant: Blue Spike, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv01105
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 11/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
November 12, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss; Denying as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Resetting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint; Continuing Case Management Conference. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
December 10, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS; STAYING CASE; VACATING HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE., Case stayed., ***Deadlines terminated. 19 MOTION to Dismiss [AOptix's First Amended Complaint] filed by Blue Spike, LLC is submitted on the papers and the 12/17/2013 hearing date is vacated; 1/27/14 Case Management Conference is vacated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/10/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
June 11, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 19 Motion to Dismiss (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AOptix Technologies v. Blue Spike, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AOptix Technologies
Represented By: David M. Lacy Kusters
Represented By: Bryan A. Kohm
Represented By: Darren E. Donnelly
Represented By: Teresa M. Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Spike, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.