Saleh v. Bush et al

Plaintiff: Sundus Shaker Saleh
Defendant: Condoleezza Rice, Colin L. Powell, Paul M. Wolfowitz, Donald H. Rumsfeld, George W. Bush and Richard B. Cheney
Case Number: 3:2013cv01124
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 38 Motion for Hearing; granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
November 3, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States; 38 MOTION for Hearing pursuant to Osborn v. Haley in support of Second Amended Complaint filed by Sundus Shaker Saleh. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
August 18, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 43 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Richard B. Cheney, Paul M. Wolfowitz, Condoleezza Rice, Donald H. Rumsfeld, The United States, Colin L. Powell, George W. Bush. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
June 20, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 38 MOTION for Hearing pursuant to Osborn v. Haley in support of Second Amended Complaint filed by Richard B. Cheney, Paul M. Wolfowitz, Condoleezza Rice, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Colin L. Powell, George W. Bush. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 20, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
May 19, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 29 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
March 25, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States, 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 25, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
October 18, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Enlargement of Briefing Deadlines filed by Richard B. Cheney, Paul M. Wolfowitz, Condoleezza Rice, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Colin L. Powell, George W. Bush. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
September 6, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Deadlines filed by Sundus Shaker Saleh. Motions terminated as moot: 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The United States. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 6, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saleh v. Bush et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condoleezza Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin L. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Wolfowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald H. Rumsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sundus Shaker Saleh
Represented By: Dave Inder Comar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?