Graves et al v. Southwestern & Pacific Specialty Finance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Minerva Lopez and Bill Graves
Defendant: Southwestern & Pacific Specialty Finance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01159
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/27/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order Granting 61 STIPULATION Staying Case Pending July 29, 2014 Settlement Conference. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/28/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed on 5/5/2014 by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong 50 MOTION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 51 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION.Amended Pleadings due by 3/21/2014. Class Certification Motion due by 7/1/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2015 01:00 PM. Jury Selection / Jury Trial ( 5 day)set for 7/13/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/19/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 19 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graves et al v. Southwestern & Pacific Specialty Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern & Pacific Specialty Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Adrienne R. Salerno
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Jantsch
Represented By: Mark C. Dosker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey Neil Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Graves
Represented By: Jeffrey Neil Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?