Gilbert v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Sean L. Gilbert
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., MoneyMutual, LLC, Selling Source, LLC, Effective Marketing Solutions, LLC, London Bay Capital, LLC, Montel Brian Anthony Williams, Aaron Shoaf and Glenn McKay
Case Number: 3:2013cv01171
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER TO DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COURT SHOULD CONSIDER OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/21/17. Show Cause Response due by 8/25/2017.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/8/17. Show Cause Response due by 6/16/2017.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER GRANTING 346 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 343 MOTION to Decertify Class and/or Disqualify Jeffrey Wilens and Jeffrey Spencer. Responses due by 8/24/2016. Replies due by 8/31/2016. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Discovery Order regarding Interrogatory number 13 and the timing of pending discovery. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER: Re 338 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Discovery Hearing set for 7/21/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/14/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER RESOLVING 326 Administrative Motion for Clarification or in the Alternative for Additional Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 20, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler re: 308 and 314 . The court denies the motion for leave to depose Jeffrey Wilens. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Amended Discovery Order. The attached order corrects a typographical error on page 5, line 8, and is otherwise unchanged. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER re sealing motion at ECF No. 262. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER ACCEPTING SUBSTITUTIONS OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/8/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2016. Discovery due by 8/31/2016. Expert Witness List due by 11/30/2016. Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/19/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 227 MOTION to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER REQUIRING SUR-REPLIES RE 226 Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint and 227 Motion to Certify Class. Sur-Replies due by 1/25/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 19, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER re 245 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Order to Show Cause to Plaintiffs' Counsel. Supplemental Briefs due by 1/22/2016. Show Cause Response due by 1/22/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 13, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING: 242 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document The Money Mutual Defendants and Montel Williams CORRECTED Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document No. 229 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016) Modified on 1/7/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER GRANTING 241 Stipulation for Further Stay of Plaintiff Keeya Malone's Claims. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 6, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 223 STIPULATION of the Parties Continuing Case Management Conference and Hearing on Class Certification. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/20/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT JOHNSON. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/21/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, 178 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BY DAVID JOHNSON; STAYING CLAIMS PENDING ARBITRATION; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING KEEYA MALONES CLAIMS AGAINST JOHNSON. Show Cause Response due by 4/24/2015. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/8/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER LIFTING CONDITIONAL SEAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/19/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/11/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ADDRESSING ENTRY OF PARTIAL JUDGMENT; AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/9/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION FROM CANE BAY DEFENDANTS ON MOTIONS TO SEAL AND WARNING RE FOOTNOTES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/15/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING 156 STIPULATION TO TRAIL START TIME ON ORAL ARGUMENT. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2015 09:45 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/7/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/5/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER TAKING 144 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal UNDER ADVISEMENT AND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO RE-FILE DOCKET NO. 145. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/16/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER REGARDING 137 THE PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER DATED NOVEMBER 24, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/26/2014.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/23/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/2/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER RE COVER LETTER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REQUIRING CHAMBERS COPIES RE: 48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6), 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 64 MOTION to Dismiss, 72 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, 104 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/2/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND RESOLVING LETTER BRIEFS RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/25/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal without prejudice.(vclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING 87 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIN TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE DECLARATION OF AARON SHOAF AND EXHIBITS THERETO. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON 48 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Bank of America, N.A., 50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Aaron Shoaf, Effective Marketing Solutions, LLC, and 64 Motion to Dismiss filed by Brian Rauch, Glenn McKay, Partner Weekly, LLC, TSS Acquisition Company, LLC, Selling Source, LLC, MoneyMutual, LLC, John Hashman, London Bay Capital, LLC, Montel Brian Anthony Williams. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 6, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER STRIKING OVERSIZED BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013) Modified on 12/9/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE MOTION TO SEAL AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013) Modified on 10/21/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/21/2013 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER TERMINATING MOTIONS IN LIGHT OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/11/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 33 Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO REMAND AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 STIPULATION CONTINUING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/24/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/19/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013) Modified on 4/19/2013 (jswlc3, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean L. Gilbert
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Spencer
Represented By: Jeffrey Neil Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel H. Bookin
Represented By: Randall W. Edwards
Represented By: Dixie Lee Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MoneyMutual, LLC
Represented By: Donald J. Putterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selling Source, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Effective Marketing Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: London Bay Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montel Brian Anthony Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Shoaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?