Gucci America, Inc. v. Golden Harvest Investment and Trading Inc et al
Plaintiff: Gucci America, Inc.
Defendant: Golden Harvest Investment and Trading Inc, TNL and Cynthia Chan King
Case Number: 3:2013cv01197
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re 61 Certificate of Counsel filed by Gucci America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/23/2014. (Court hereby continues the date for certification that the agreed consideration for settlement has not been delivered, to ten (10) dyas from the dte of this order.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re 54 Certificate of Counsel re Alternatively to Continue Certification Deadline, filed by Gucci America, Inc. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER of DISMISSAL (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/31/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Notice and Request to continue CMC filed by Gucci America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/28/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 STIPULATION (Joint) to Further Continue Case Management Conference filed by Gucci America, Inc.. Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/1/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/8/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint) Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Gucci America, Inc. Supplemental Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/6/201. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gucci America, Inc. v. Golden Harvest Investment and Trading Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Harvest Investment and Trading Inc
Represented By: Kevin Walter Isaacson
Represented By: Kevin Patrick O'Brien
Represented By: Curtis R. Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Chan King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gucci America, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?