Actuate Corporation v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Actuate Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv01202
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 12 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
July 1, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO DISMISS CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/1/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
May 9, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 8 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint and Adjourning Initial Case Management Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Actuate Corporation v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Thomas Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Actuate Corporation
Represented By: James Mitchell Lee
Represented By: Cyrus M Khojandpour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.