Derus v. California Home Medical Equipment, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Alis Derus
Defendant: California Home Medical Equipment, Inc, Bernie Zimmer and Emmanuel Polin
Case Number: 3:2013cv01411
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/27/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 13, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL. The parties must file a notice of dismissal or an updated explanation of the settlement status by 10/19/2015. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/13/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
September 15, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 9/24/2015 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/15/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
August 19, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 10/9/2015 before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/19/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
July 14, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Rescheduling Pretrial Conference and Compelling Plaintiff's Deposition 81 . Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/14/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
July 8, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SHORTENING TIME 76 . By 7/9/2015 parties to submit stipulation with times and dates of Derus deposition. Non-expert discovery deadline 7/31/2015. Expert discovery deadline 8/31/2015. Last day to file dispositive motions 8/31/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2015 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2015 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/8/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
December 12, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Rescheduling Case Management Conference from 1/14/2015 to 1/21/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose 48 . Counsel may appear telephonically and must contact the Courtroom Deputy at 408.535.5343 for further arrangements. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/12/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
August 5, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derus v. California Home Medical Equipment, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alis Derus
Represented By: Laurel Angela Mousseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Home Medical Equipment, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernie Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmanuel Polin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?