Net Connection, LLC et al v. County of Alameda
Plaintiff: Net Connection, LLC and Web Access, LLC
Defendant: County of Alameda
Case Number: 3:2013cv01467
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/18/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO FILE STATEMENT RE EFFECT OF CALIFORNIA SUPREME COURT DECISION IN PEOPLE V. GREWAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RE: STAY. The first status statement is due 90 days from the date of this order.(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/12/2015) Modified on 2/13/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 11/6/13 is continued to 12/6/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/21/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 4 25 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Parties respectfully request the Court continue defendants responsive pleading deadline from April 23, 2013 to April 30, 2013.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/23/23. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Net Connection, LLC et al v. County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Net Connection, LLC
Represented By: Tory Edward Griffin
Represented By: Stephen James Meyer
Represented By: Kelly Lois Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Web Access, LLC
Represented By: Tory Edward Griffin
Represented By: Stephen James Meyer
Represented By: Kelly Lois Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Represented By: Michael Charles Wenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?