Polnicky v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al

Plaintiff: Steven Polnicky
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Wells Fargo & Company Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2013cv01478
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/29/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW 47 50 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SEAL 46 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting request to appear by phone. See order for instructions. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 25 28 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polnicky v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Polnicky
Represented By: Beth Davis
Represented By: Corinne Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Pamela E. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Pamela E. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?