Shankar v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al

Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Transportation Security Administration and United Airlines Corporation
Plaintiff: Ryan Shankar
Case Number: 3:2013cv01490
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES 15 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Joint case management statement and consent/declination by the remaining parties due 8/28/2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/19/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
October 29, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court (*DISREGARD ERRONEOUSLY POSTED IN WRONG CASE NUMBER - DISREGARD**) ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/29/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013) Modified on 10/29/2013 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS 28 35 . Plaintiff has until 3/5/2014 to file a second amended complaint and file a statement regarding plaintiffs consent to the appointment of a guardian ad litem. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
March 4, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF FEDERAL DEFENDANTS 57 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/4/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
May 6, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE COPY OF PETITION. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/6/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shankar v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Shankar
Represented By: Andrea M. Tytell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.