Graham v. U.S. Bank National Association et al

Plaintiff: Bricen B. Graham
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01613
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying 23 Motion to Set Aside Judgment (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
May 23, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 6 Motion to Dismiss; denying 9 Motion to Remand. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 10, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Discharging 15 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 05/10/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 9, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/10/2013 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 05/09/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricen B. Graham
Represented By: Chris T Nguyen
Represented By: Joel Mark Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Chambers
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?