Pennington v. Lewis

Petitioner: Dietrich Pennington
Respondent: G. Lewis
Case Number: 3:2013cv01725
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Referring Judge: PSLC MWD
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
March 26, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/26/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
August 26, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUERIS; ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE FILING FEE BY OCTOBER 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
October 2, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/1/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dietrich Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.