NobelBiz, Inc. v. LiveVox Inc.

Plaintiff: NobelBiz, Inc.
Defendant: LiveVox Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01773
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2016 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING STAY; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing re status of the appeal in Federal Circuit is set for Friday, 9/16/2016 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/7/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
February 2, 2016 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING STAY; VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (137 in 4:13-cv-01846-YGR) Statement filed by NobelBiz, Inc. The Compliance hearing set for 2/5/2016 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 3/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Updated Joint CMC statement filed 2/29/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/2/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
December 18, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (151) Joint Motion to Stay in case 4:13-cv-01773-YGR; granting (135) Joint Motion to Stay in case 4:13-cv-01846-YGR (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
November 24, 2015 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re: (133 in 4:13-cv-01846-YGR) Case Management Statement filed by NobelBiz, Inc., (149 in 4:13-cv-01773-YGR). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
October 8, 2015 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re (143 in 4:13-cv-01773-YGR) Case Management Statement filed by NobelBiz, Inc., (126 in 4:13-cv-01846-YGR) Case Management Statement filed by NobelBiz, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
June 29, 2015 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re (138 in 4:13-cv-01773-YGR) Joint Case Management Statement filed by LiveVox Inc., NobelBiz, Inc., (121 in 4:13-cv-01846-YGR) Joint Case Management Statement filed by Five 9, Inc., NobelBiz, I nc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to (138 in 4:13-cv-01773-YGR) Joint Case Management Statement, (121 in 4:13-cv-01846-YGR) Joint Case Management Statement. Responses due by 3/18/2016. Replies due by 4/1/2016. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/29/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
April 27, 2015 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE and Supplemental Statement regarding co-pending litigations re 130 Joint Case Management Statement filed by LiveVox Inc., NobelBiz, Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/27/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
March 13, 2015 127 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED, AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/13/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
January 16, 2015 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIM TERMS IN DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/16/2015. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
June 2, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEYS re 105 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, filed by NobelBiz, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/2/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NobelBiz, Inc. v. LiveVox Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NobelBiz, Inc.
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Charles H Chevalier
Represented By: Elizabeth DeRieux
Represented By: Ralph Albert Dengler
Represented By: Julia D. Greer
Represented By: William A Hector
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Knowles
Represented By: Andrew Peter MacArthur
Represented By: Todd M Nosher
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LiveVox Inc.
Represented By: Favad Rauf Bajaria
Represented By: E Paul Cauley, Jr.
Represented By: Robert M Harkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?