In Re: Heller Ehrman LLP

Movant: Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Respondent: Heller Ehrman LLP
Case Number: 3:2013cv01775
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/24/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
May 13, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 05/10/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 21, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 6 Motion For De Novo Determination. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Heller Ehrman LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Represented By: Pamela Phillips
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Diana Donohoe DiGennaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Heller Ehrman LLP
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: Matthew Rutledge Schultz
Represented By: Gregory Caesar Nuti
Represented By: Mario R Nicholas
Represented By: Jeffrey Taylor Makoff
Represented By: Kevin W. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.