Ohio Public Employees Retirement System et al v. McKesson Corporation
Plaintiff: Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation, State Teachers' Retirement System of Ohio, Ohio Public Employees Retirement System and Highway Patrol Retirement System
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv02000
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/12/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER, Motions terminated: 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/7/14 is continued to 3/21/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/31/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER, Motions terminated: 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Ohio Public Employees Retirement System. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/22/13 is continued to 2/7/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/12/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013) Modified on 11/13/2013 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 41 Stipulation Re: ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL BUSINESS INFORMATION (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER, Motions terminated: 28 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by McKesson Corporation filed by McKesson Corporation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/23/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for8/2/13 at 2:30 p.m. is continued 8/9/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/21/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting {16] Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Judge Illston's standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Bryant McCulley (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Public Employees Retirement System et al v. McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation
Represented By: Ali Abtahi
Represented By: Stuart H. McCluer
Represented By: R. Bryant McCulley
Represented By: Idene Saam
Represented By: James L. Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Robert S Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Teachers' Retirement System of Ohio
Represented By: Ali Abtahi
Represented By: Stuart H. McCluer
Represented By: R. Bryant McCulley
Represented By: Idene Saam
Represented By: James L. Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Robert S Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Public Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Robert S Wood
Represented By: James L. Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Idene Saam
Represented By: R. Bryant McCulley
Represented By: Stuart H. McCluer
Represented By: Ali Abtahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highway Patrol Retirement System
Represented By: Ali Abtahi
Represented By: Stuart H. McCluer
Represented By: R. Bryant McCulley
Represented By: Idene Saam
Represented By: James L. Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Robert S Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?