Cauthen v. H&R Block, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cauthen
Defendant: HRB Tax Group, Inc., H&R Block, Inc. and HRB Technology LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv02142
Filed: May 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. IN RE: H&R BLOCK IRS FORM 8863 LITIGATION. MDL No. 2474. Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel on 10/28/13. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 7 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE RE FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cauthen v. H&R Block, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRB Tax Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRB Technology LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cauthen
Represented By: Shelley Lynn Kaufman
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?