Shaw v. Westmoor Village, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cecil Shaw
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation, Harshad I. Patel, Shi Yong Lin, Westmoor Village, LLC, Hany Selim and Marcelle Dabbas
Case Number: 3:2013cv02164
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re 52 Notice (Other) filed by Cecil Shaw, Setting Case Management Conference for June 12, 2014 (to be vacated upon the filing of dispositional settlement documents). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/7/2014. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/19/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE 45 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/11/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DATES IN SCHEDULING ORDER UNDER GENERAL ORDER 56. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/26/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS MARCELLE DABBAS AND HANY SELIM ONLY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/13/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DATES IN SCHEDULING ORDER UNDER GENERAL ORDER 56. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/17/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Westmoor Village, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harshad I. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shi Yong Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westmoor Village, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hany Selim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelle Dabbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Shaw
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?