TPK Touch Solutions, Inc v. Wintek Electro-Optics Corportation et al
Plaintiff: TPK Touch Solutions, Inc
Defendant: Wintek Electro-Optics Corportation and Wintek Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv02218
Filed: May 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 94 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Order as Modified by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 92 Stipulation and Joint Notice of Settlement and Motion to Stay Deadlines.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 85 Stipulation Staying Discovery and Enlarging the Close of Fact Discovery Deadline.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/9/14. (Filed on 5/9/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Plaintiff TPK Touch Solutions, Inc.'s Request to Amend P.L.R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions filed by TPK Touch Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 45 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AMENDED ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY PENDING EX PARTE REEXAMINATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 28 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY PENDING EX PARTE REEXAMINATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 28 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Change Time of Case Management Conference filed by Wintek Corporation, Wintek Electro-Optics Corportation. Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 11, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TPK Touch Solutions, Inc v. Wintek Electro-Optics Corportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintek Electro-Optics Corportation
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wintek Corporation
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TPK Touch Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Bijal Vijay Vakil
Represented By: Kao-Yu Hsu
Represented By: Shamita D. Etienne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?