The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco et al v. The City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco and The Archdiocese of San Francisco Parish Real Property Support Corporation
Defendant: The City and County of San Francisco and San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, U.S. Pipe & Foundry Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv02220
Filed: May 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/23/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STATUS ORDER: Parties to file updated status reports every 60 days. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/3/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DEADLINES. PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT EVERY 30 DAYS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/17/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 11 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco et al v. The City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco
Represented By: John Clinton Callan
Represented By: Gerald M. Murphy
Represented By: Gerald Michael Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Archdiocese of San Francisco Parish Real Property Support Corporation
Represented By: John Clinton Callan
Represented By: Gerald M. Murphy
Represented By: Gerald Michael Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Dennis J. Herrera
Represented By: Donald Paul Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Public Utilities Commission, U.S. Pipe & Foundry Company LLC
Represented By: John Lauchlan Kortum
Represented By: Kenneth C. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?