Surbey v. Pacific Gas & Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Surbey
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Corporation and Pacific Gas & Electric Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv02402
Filed: May 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/23/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION: Non-Expert Discovery cutoff is 2/16/2015. Motions due by 3/9/2015. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Jury Selection set for 6/2/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Jury Trial set for 6/2/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for an estimated length of 6 days. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/6/2014. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER continuing case management conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/15/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by the Hon. Thelton E. Henderson denying 64 Motion to continue July 7, 2014 case management conference and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Counsel shall appear as scheduled for the case management conference. Plaintiff's counsel shall come prepared to show cause as to why monetary sanctions should not issue. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/06/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/9/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER withdrawing 49 Appointment of special master for discovery. Parties shall come prepared to discuss issue at 03/03/14 case management conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/12/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER appointing special master for discovery. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/06/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/03/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order Regarding Meet and Confer Session Scheduled for November 5, 2013 (ygrlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REQUIRING PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON NOVEMBER 5, 2013 TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/1/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surbey v. Pacific Gas & Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Surbey
Represented By: Spencer Freeman Smith
Represented By: Dow Wakefield Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?