Largan Precision Co, LTD v. Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Largan Precision Co, LTD
Defendant: Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.
Interested Party: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02502
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #466 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 25, 2016 Filing 466 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #464 Order Dismissing Case filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
July 20, 2016 Filing 465 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/19/2016. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 15, 2016 Filing 463 Clerk's Notice Vacating Settlement Conference re: 458 In light of the parties' settlement, the court vacates the 7/20 settlement conference. The parties may contact the court to reschedule a settlement conference if they need to. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 7/15/2016) Modified on 7/18/2016 (klhS, COURT STAFF). This is a text only docket entry. There is no document attached to this notice
July 15, 2016 Filing 462 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceeding in Light of Settlement filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Responses due by 7/20/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 461 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 460 UFCA JUDGMENT as to #437 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 15, 2016 Filing 459 MANDATE of USFA as to #437 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
May 10, 2016 Filing 458 CLERK'S NOTICE: At the parties' request, the court sets a settlement conference for July 20, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Settlement Conference Statements due July 13, 2016. The court's previous Settlement Order at ECF No. 426 remains in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 457 STATUS REPORT re: Settlement Conference Date and Case Status (Joint) by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 456 Order terminating #361 Motion in Limine entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 Order terminating #379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Order terminating #347 Motion in Limine entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 Order terminating #346 Motion in Limine entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Order terminating #345 Motion in Limine entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Order terminating #344 Motion in Limine entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Order terminating #331 Motion to Amend/Correct ; entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Order terminating #320 Motion to Continue entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 448 Order terminating #224 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Order terminating #223 Motion entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Order terminating #218 Motion to Strike entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Order terminating #217 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Order terminating #213 Motion entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Order terminating #211 Motion entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 442 Order terminating #209 Motion entered by Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATE by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting #440 Motion to Continue. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 440 MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference Date and [Proposed] Order filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 439 USFC Case Number 15-1695 for #437 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 17, 2015 Filing 438 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Largan Motion for Reconsideration filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Laura Mullendore, #3 Proposed Order)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 437 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-9560225. Appeal Record due by 6/29/2015. (Yang, Ming-Tao) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 28, 2015 Filing 436 NOTICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD Notice of Withdrawal (Kennedy) (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 13, 2015 Filing 435 NOTICE of Appearance by Ming-Tao Yang Notice of Appearance of Co-Counsel for Largan Precision (Yang, Ming-Tao) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #433 Stipulated Motion to Change Time Regarding Deadline to File Bill of Costs and Motions for Attorneys' Fees. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
May 12, 2015 Filing 433 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulated Motion to Change Time Re Deadline to File Bills of Costs and Motions for Attorneys' Fees filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Mullendore)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Order by Hon. James Donato denying #430 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 431 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 29, 2015 Filing 430 MOTION for Leave to File Largans Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of the Courts Order Re Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment Re Infringement filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Engle Decl ISO Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit 1 to Engle Decl Redacted, #3 Exhibit 2 to Engle Decl Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 3 to Engle Decl Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 4 to Engle Decl Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 5 to Engle Decl)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF PARTIAL JUDGMENT UNDER FRCP 54(B). The clerk is directed to enter final judgment as stated in the order. The case is otherwise stayed, except for any activities related to the previously-ordered settlement conference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/29/2015. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 21, 2015 Filing 428 Brief re 424 Order Defendant Genius's Brief in Support of Entry of Partial Judgment Under Rule 54(b) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. (Related document(s) 424 ) (Sipiora, David) (Filed on 4/21/2015) Modified on 4/22/2015 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2015 Filing 427 Brief re 424 Order Statement In Opposition To Entry of Partial Final Judgment filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Related document(s) 424 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 4/21/2015) Modified on 4/22/2015 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 426 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Settlement Conference set for 8/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/20/2015. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
April 15, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for a settlement conference, to be held when her schedule permits. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 Order re #423 Joint Notice. By 4/21/15, the parties should advise the Court if they jointly agree to stipulate to entry of final judgment of non-infringement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) to the same extent summary judgment was granted in Genius's favor in #422 the Court's Summary Judgment Order. If the parties agree to this, the stipulation should include a short statement of why the determination of non-infringement is final and why there is no just reason for delay of judgment. See Curtiss-Wright Corp. v. General Elec. Co., 446 U.S. 1, 7-8 (1980); W.L. Gore & Assocs., Inc. v. Int'l Med. Prostetics Res. Assocs., Inc., 975 F.2d 858, 861-62 (Fed. Cir. 1992). Otherwise, the parties should file by 4/21/15 simultaneous briefs of no more than 5 pages on why the Court should or should not enter partial judgment under Rule 54(b). (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 423 NOTICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #422 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Joint Notice (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting in part and denying in part #214 and #215 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment re Infringement. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER of USFC as to #334 Appeal (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 24, 2015 Filing 420 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Replace Incorrectly Filed Documents filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Apple, #4 Declaration of Genius, #5 Declaration of Motorola, #6 Proposed Order)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 20, 2015 Filing 419 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Largan Precision Co, LTD for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Reid, Joseph) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 20, 2015 Filing 418 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/18/2015, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number 415-264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #417 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2015. (Related documents(s) #417 ) (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 19, 2015 Filing 417 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 19, 2015 Filing 416 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2015. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2015) Modified on 3/19/2015 (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2015 Filing 415 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re GS-8696 [331-2] by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 56 to Reply ISO MSJ Infringement [313-5], #2 Exhibit 57 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-12], #3 Exhibit 57 to Reply ISO MSJ Infringement [313-6], #4 Exhibit 51 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-6], #5 Exhibit 17 to Reply ISO Barbastathis Daubert [306-2]; Exhibit 18 to Largan Opp'ns to Genius Motions in Limine [348-2]; Exhibit 16 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-16], #6 Exhibit 23 to Reply ISO MSJ Validity [308-9], #7 Exhibit Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness #309 , #8 Exhibit 53 to Reply ISO MSJ Infringement [313-2]; Exhibit 47 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-2]; Exhibit 3 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-3], #9 Exhibit 48 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-3]; Exhibit 8 to Reply ISO Swinehart Daubert [310-4]; Exhibit 11 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-11];, #10 Exhibit 49 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-4], #11 Exhibit 7 to Reply ISO Swinehart Daubert [310-3], #12 Exhibit 54 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-9], #13 Exhibit 56 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-11], #14 Exhibit Reply ISO Swinehart Daubert #310 , #15 Exhibit 6 to Reply ISO Swinehart Daubert [310-2], #16 Exhibit Reply ISO MSJ Infringement #313 , #17 Exhibit 58 to Reply ISO MSJ Infringement [313-7], #18 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re GS-8696 #331 , #19 Exhibit Esterhay Decl. ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re GS-8696 [331-1], #20 Exhibit 3 to Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re GS-8696 [331-4], #21 Exhibit Reply ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re GS-8696 #336 , #22 Exhibit Bentley Declaration ISO Reply ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions re GS-8696 [336-1], #23 Exhibit Opp'n to Genius Motion in Limine No. 1 [344-1], #24 Exhibit 19 to Largan Opp'n to Genius Motions in Limine [348-3], #25 Exhibit 20 to Largan Opp'ns to Genius Motions in Limine [348-4], #26 Exhibit 21 to Largan Opp'ns to Genius Motions in Limine [348-5], #27 Exhibit 22 to Largan Opp'ns to Genius Motions in Limine [348-6], #28 Exhibit 23 to Largan Opp'ns to Genius Motions in Limine [348-7], #29 Exhibit 25 to Largan Opp'ns to Genius Motions in Limine [348-9], #30 Exhibit Joint Pretrial Statement #350 , #31 Exhibit Largan Trial Brief #351 , #32 Exhibit Largan Motion in Limine No. 1 #354 , #33 Exhibit Opp'n to Largan Motion in Limine No. 1 [354-1], #34 Exhibit A to Opp'n to Largan Motion in Limine No. 1 [354-3], #35 Exhibit 1 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-1], #36 Exhibit 7 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-7], #37 Exhibit 10 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-10], #38 Exhibit 15 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-15])(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 414 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Copy of [348-2] Exhibit 18 to Declaration of M. Engle in Support of Plaintiff Largan Precicion Co., Ltd.'s Oppositions to Defendant Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.'s Motions In Limine, re 406 Order re Order Striking Administrative Motions to Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Copy of [348-3] Exhibit 19, #2 Unredacted Copy of [348-4] Exhibit 20, #3 Unredacted Copy of [348-5] Exhibit 21, #4 Unredacted Copy of [348-6] Exhibit 22, #5 Unredacted Copy of [348-7] Exhibit 23, #6 Unredacted Copy of [348-9] Exhibit 25)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 413 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , Unredacted Copy of [344-1] Largan Opposition to Genius Motion in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Documents and Related Testimony Regarding 2011 Patent Assertion, re 406 Order re Order Striking Administrative Motions to Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 412 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , Unredacted Copy of #335 Opposition to Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions to Add GS-8696, re 406 Order re Order Striking Administrative Motions to Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Unredacted Copy of [335-1] Declaration of J. Connor, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Copy of [335-2] Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Copy of [335-3] Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Copy of [335-4] Exhibit 3)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 411 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , Unredacted Copy of [316-5] Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to Submit Documents for In Camera Inspection and for Stay of Order, re 406 Order re Order Striking Administrative Motions to Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 410 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Copy of [314-2] Exhibit A to Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper, re 406 Order re Order Striking Administrative Motions to Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Copy of [314-3] Exhibit B, #2 Unredacted Copy of [314-4] Exhibit C, #3 Unredacted Copy of [314-5] Exhibit D, #4 Unredacted Copy of [314-7] Exhibit F, #5 Unredacted Copy of [314-9] Exhibit H)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 409 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Copy of #312 Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales, re 406 Order re Order Striking Administrative Motions to Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 408 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Copy of #311 Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, re 406 Order re Order Striking Administrative Motions to Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Copy of [311-2] Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Copy of [311-3] Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Copy of [311-5] Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Copy of [311-7] Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Copy of [311-9] Exhibit H)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 407 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , Unredacted Copy of #307 Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper, re 406 Order re Order Striking Administrative Motions to Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Copy of [307-2] Exhibit A, #2 Unredacted Copy of [307-3] Exhibit B)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER re #305 Order Striking Administrative Motions to Seal. The parties must also file under seal unredacted copies of all documents subject to their motion to seal, unless they have already done so or the Court has denied the motion with respect to that document in its entirety. Those documents were only made available in binders lodged with chambers, and must be filed in the docket to be considered by the Court. The unredacted copies should be filed as soon as possible. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #404 Unopposed Administrative Motion and Order Approving Powerpoint Presentations at Dispositive Motions Hearing. The parties may use Powerpoint presentations and/or submit handouts to the Court at the hearing on 3/18/15 at 10:00 am. The hearing will focus on #214 and #215 , the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment regarding infringement. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 404 MOTION Unopposed Administrative Motion for Approval of PowerPoint Presentation at Dispositive Motion Hearing filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 3/31/2015. Replies due by 4/7/2015. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 403 EXHIBITS re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness #309 filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 53 to Reply ISO MSJ Infringement [313-2]; Exhibit 47 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-2]; Exhibit 3 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-3], #2 Exhibit Exhibit 48 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-3]; Exhibit 8 to Reply ISO Swinehart Daubert [310-4]; Exhibit 11 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-11]; Exhibit 12 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-11], #3 Exhibit Exhibit 49 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-4], #4 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Reply ISO Swinehart Daubert [310-3], #5 Exhibit Exhibit 54 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-9], #6 Exhibit Reply ISO Swinehart Daubert #310 , #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Reply ISO Swinehart Daubert [310-2], #8 Exhibit Reply ISO MSJ Infringement #313 , #9 Exhibit Oppn to Genius Motion in Limine No. 1 [344-1, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 23 to Largan Oppns to Genius Motions in Limine [348-7], #11 Exhibit Joint Pretrial Statement #350 , #12 Exhibit Largan Trial Brief #351 , #13 Exhibit Largan Motion in Limine No. 1 #354 , #14 Exhibit Oppn to Largan Motion in Limine No. 1 [354-1], #15 Exhibit Exhibit A to Oppn to Largan Motion in Limine No. 1 [354-3], #16 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-1], #17 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-7])(Related document(s) #373 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 402 EXHIBITS re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 32 to MSJ Willfulness [224-12] filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 33 to MSJ Willfulness [224-12], #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Largan Discovery Letter Brief [274-1], #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Largan Discovery Letter Brief [274-2], #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Oppn to Motion to Strike Napper [288-4]; Exhibit A to Oppn to Napper Daubert re Reasonable Royalty [278-2]; Exhibit 17 to Reply ISO Barbastathis Daubert [306-2]; Exhibit 18 to Largan Oppns to Genius Motions in Limine [348-2]; Exhibit 16 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-16], #5 Exhibit Oppn to Napper Daubert re Worldwide Sales #279 , #6 Exhibit Exhibit A to Oppn to Napper Daubert re Worldwide Sales [279-2]; Exhibit A to Oppn to MSJ Non-Infringement [289-2], #7 Exhibit Exhibit I to Oppn to Motion to Strike Napper [288-11], #8 Exhibit Oppn to MSJ Non-Infringement #289 , #9 Exhibit Exhibit B to Oppn to MSJ Non-Infringement [289-3])(Related document(s) #373 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 401 EXHIBITS re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 9 to MSJ Infringement [214-3]; Exhibit 8 to Opp'n to Motion to Strike Bentley [186-10]; Exhibit D to Opp'n to MSJ Non-Infringement [289-5]; Exhibit 56 to Reply ISO MSJ Infringement [313-5] filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 50 to MSJ Infringement [214-7]; Exhibit 43 to MSJ Willfulness [224-13], #2 Exhibit Swinehart Daubert #223 , #3 Exhibit MSJ Willfulness #224 , #4 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to MSJ Willfulness [224-2], #5 Exhibit Exhibit 24 to MSJ Willfulness [224-11], #6 Exhibit Exhibit 25 to MSJ Willfulness [224-11], #7 Exhibit Exhibit 26 to MSJ Willfulness [224-11])(Related document(s) #373 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 400 EXHIBITS re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 6 to MSJ Infringement [214-9]; Exhibit 6 to MSJ Willlfulness [224-15] filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 47 to MSJ Infringement [214-7]; Exhibit G to Oppn to MSJ Non-Infringement [289-8], #2 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Oppn to Motion to Strike Bentley [186-7], #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to MSJ Infringement [214-2]; Exhibit 55 to Reply ISO MSJ Infringement [313-4]; Exhibit C to Oppn to MSJ Non-Infringement [289-4], #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Barbastathis Daubert [213-3]; Exhibit 29 to MSJ Infringement [214-5]; Exhibit 40 to MSJ Willfulness [224-12], #5 Exhibit MSJ Infringement #214 , #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to MSJ Infringement [214-2]; Exhibit 8 to MSJ Willfulness [224-3], #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to MSJ Infringement [214-2]; Exhibit 9 to MSJ Willfulness [224-3], #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to MSJ Infringement [214-2], #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to MSJ Infringement [214-3], #10 Exhibit Exhibits 19, 34, and 35 to MSJ Infringement [214-4] [214-5], #11 Exhibit Exhibit 20 to MSJ Infringement [214-4], #12 Exhibit Exhibit 21 to MSJ Infringement [214-4], #13 Exhibit Exhibit 22 to MSJ Infringement [214-4]; Exhibit 3 to Swinehart Daubert [223-4], #14 Exhibit Exhibit 27 to MSJ Infringement [214-5], #15 Exhibit Exhibit 32 to MSJ Infringement [214-5]; Exhibit 42 to MSJ Willfulness [224-13])(Related document(s) #373 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 399 REDACTION to #348 Declaration in Support,, Revised Redacted Version of [348-2] Exhibit 18 to Declaration of M. Engle in Support of Plaintiff Largan Precicion Co., Ltd.'s Oppositions to Defendant Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.'s Motions In Limine, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [348-7] Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Version of [348-8] Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of [348-11] Exhibit 27)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 398 REDACTION to #344 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Documents and Related Testimony Regarding 2011 Patent Assertion , Revised Redacted Version of [344-1] Largan Opposition, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 397 EXHIBITS re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Largan Discovery Letter Brief #150 filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Extend Discovery re Motorola #151 , #2 Exhibit Engle Decl. ISO Motion to Extend Discovery re Motorola [151-2], #3 Exhibit Exhibit 31 to MSJ Infringement [214-5]; Exhibit 45 to MSJ Willfulness [224-13], #4 Exhibit Exhibit F to Oppn to MSJ Non-Infringement [289-7], #5 Exhibit Engle Decl. ISO Oppn to MSJ Non-Infringement [289-1], #6 Exhibit Exhibit K to Oppn to MSJ Non-Infringement [289-12], #7 Exhibit Exhibit 50 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-5], #8 Exhibit Exhibit 55 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-10], #9 Exhibit Exhibit 59 to Reply ISO MSJ Infringement [313-8], #10 Exhibit Exhibit 27 to Largan Oppns to Genius Motions in Limine [348-11]; Exhibit 6 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-6], #11 Exhibit Largan Motion in Limine No. 6 #360 , #12 Exhibit Largan Motion in Limine No. 7 #361 , #13 Exhibit Oppn to Largan Motion in Limine No. 7 [361-1], #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-13], #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Largan Motions in Limine [363-14], #16 Exhibit Exhibit 53 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-8 ]; Exhibit 24 to Largan Oppns to Genius Motions in Limine [348-8], #17 Exhibit Exhibit 18 to MSJ Willfulness [224-10]; Exhibit 53 to Reply ISO MSJ Willfulness [309-8]; Exhibit 24 to Largan Oppns to Genius Motions in Limine [348-8])(Related document(s) #373 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 396 REDACTION Revised Redacted Version of [316-5] Exhibit A to Motion for Leave to Submit Documents for In Camera Inspection and for Stay of Order, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 395 REDACTION to #314 Reply to Opposition/Response, Revised Redacted Version of [314-2] Exhibit A to Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Revised Redacted Version of [314-3] Exhibit B, #2 Revised Redacted Version of [314-4] Exhibit C)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 394 REDACTION to #312 Reply to Opposition/Response, Revised Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 393 REDACTION to #311 Reply to Opposition/Response, Revised Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [311-2] Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [311-5] Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [311-7] Exhibit F)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 392 REDACTION to #307 Reply to Opposition/Response, Revised Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [307-2] Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [307-3] Exhibit B)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 391 REDACTION to #291 Opposition/Response to Motion, Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Willfullness, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Version of [291-3] Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Version of [291-4] Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [291-5] Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [291-6] Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [291-7] Exhibit F)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 390 REDACTION to #286 Opposition/Response to Motion, Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony of Gregory Swinehart, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [286-2] Exhibit A)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 389 REDACTION to #282 Opposition/Response to Motion, Revised Redacted Version of [282-2] Exhibit A to Opposition to Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Dr. George Barbastathis, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 388 REDACTION to #280 Opposition/Response to Motion, Revised Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Infringement, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Version of [280-2] Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Version of [280-4] Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [280-6] Exhibit E)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 387 REDACTION to #218 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper , Revised Redacted Version, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [218-3] Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [218-4] Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [218-5] Exhibit C)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 386 REDACTION to #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement , Revised Redacted Version, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Revised Redacted Version of [215-2] Declaration of M. Leopold, #2 Declaration Revised Redacted Version of [215-3] Declaration of D. Mack-Mumford, #3 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [215-5] Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of [215-8] Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [215-9] Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [215-12] Exhibit H)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #381 Motion for Clarification. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 384 REDACTION to #211 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper , Revised Redacted Version, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [211-3] Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [211-4] Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [211-5] Exhibit C)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 383 REDACTION to #209 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales , Revised Redacted Version, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [209-3] Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Revised Redacted Version of [209-4] Exhibit B)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 382 REDACTION Revised Redacted Version of [177-3] Exhibit A to Motion to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley, re #373 Order on Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 381 MOTION Unopposed Administrative Motion for Clarification re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 3/30/2015. Replies due by 4/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 380 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #373 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Sealed Copy of Tab 48 to Binder Submitted with #366 Joint Administrative Motion to Filed Documents Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 379 APPLE INC.'S RENEWED REQUEST TO SEAL PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S ORDER OF MARCH 9, 2015 (D.I. 373)] filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan Rabinowitz, #2 (Proposed) Order)(Rabinowitz, Alan) (Filed on 3/16/2015) Text modified on 3/16/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #223 MOTION Preclude Certain Testimony of Gregory Swinehart , #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #211 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper , #209 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales, #224 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Willfullness, #214 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Infringement, #217 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Validity, #331 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions to Add GS-8696, Bifurcate Issues Related to GS-8696, and Set an Expedited Schedule and Trial for the GS-8696, #213 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Dr. George Barbastathis , #218 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 378 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Status Conference held on 3/12/2015. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Jury Selection set for 6/22/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato.(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/12/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 377 CLERK'S NOTICE Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/12/2015 10:00 AM before Hon. James Donato. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to schedule their appearance before the Court for the hearing. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Order re #375 Stipulated Notice and Request re Hearing Schedule. The Court sets a telephone conference for 3/12/15 at 10:00 am to discuss case scheduling. Only lead counsel need appear. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 375 STIPULATION re 374 Clerk's Notice,,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Stipulated Notice and Request Regarding Hearing Schedule filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 9, 2015 Filing 374 CLERK'S NOTICE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #223 MOTION Preclude Certain Testimony of Gregory Swinehart , #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #211 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper , #209 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales, #224 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Willfullness, #214 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Infringement, #217 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Validity, #331 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions to Add GS-8696, Bifurcate Issues Related to GS-8696, and Set an Expedited Schedule and Trial for the GS-8696, #213 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Dr. George Barbastathis , #218 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper. Motions Hearings continued to 3/13/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part #366 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 3, 2015 Filing 372 Letter from Counsel for Largan Precision Co. re Agenda for March 11 Omnibus Hearing. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
February 27, 2015 Filing 371 Exhibit List Amended Joint Exhibit List by Largan Precision Co, LTD.. (Attachments: *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/27/2015) Modified on 3/11/2015 (fff, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2015 Filing 370 DECLARATION of Laura Mullendore CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [360-2] filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 24, 2015 Filing 369 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Joint Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents and Replace with Public Redacted Versions filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [245-3]), #3 Exhibit 2 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [254-2]), #4 Exhibit 3 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [256-6]), #5 Exhibit 4 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [256-7]), #6 Exhibit 5 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [256-8]), #7 Exhibit 6 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [258-2]), #8 Exhibit 7 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [258-3]), #9 Exhibit 8 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [258-5]), #10 Exhibit 9 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #s [260-1]), #11 Exhibit 10 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #289 , [290-22], [302-8]), #12 Exhibit 11 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #309 ), #13 Exhibit 12 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #310 ), #14 Exhibit 13 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #313 ), #15 Exhibit 14 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #350 ), #16 Exhibit 15 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #351 ), #17 Exhibit 16 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #354 ), #18 Exhibit 17 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [354-1]), #19 Exhibit 18 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #361 ), #20 Exhibit 19 (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [361-1]))(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 24, 2015 Filing 368 EXHIBITS re #366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order #305 Exhibits O to AA filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O, #2 Exhibit P, #3 Exhibit Q, #4 Exhibit R, #5 Exhibit S, #6 Exhibit T, #7 Exhibit U, #8 Exhibit V, #9 Exhibit W, #10 Exhibit X, #11 Exhibit Y, #12 Exhibit Z, #13 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) #366 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 24, 2015 Filing 367 EXHIBITS re #366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order #305 Exhibits A to N filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #366 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 24, 2015 Filing 366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to the Court's Order #305 filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration John D. Esterhay (Largan), #3 Declaration C.J. Lin (Genius), #4 Declaration Alan M. Rabinowitz (Apple), #5 Declaration Ashutosh Upreti (Apple), #6 Declaration Renee Dubord Brown (Motorola))(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 19, 2015 Filing 365 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD Pretrial Filings filed by Largan Precision Co., Ltd. on 2/18/2015 (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 364 Witness List by Largan Precision Co, LTD Joint Witness List. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 363 Declaration of Michael J. Engle in Support of Largan Precision Co., Ltd.'s Motions in Limine #354 , #355 , #356 , #357 , #359 , #360 , #361 filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #2 Exhibit 2 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #3 Exhibit 3 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #4 Exhibit 4 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #5 Exhibit 5 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #6 Exhibit 6 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #7 Exhibit 7 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #8 Exhibit 8 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #9 Exhibit 9 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #10 Exhibit 10 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #11 Exhibit 11 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #12 Exhibit 12 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #13 Exhibit 13 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #14 Exhibit 14 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #15 Exhibit 15 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs, #16 Exhibit 16 to Engle Decl ISO Largan MILs)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 362 Proposed Form of Verdict by Largan Precision Co, LTD Joint Proposed Verdict Form. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 361 MOTION in Limine No. 7 re Genius's Awareness of the Patents-in-Suit and Infringement filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 03:00 PM before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Genius Oppo, #2 Declaration of Mullendore ISO Genius Oppo, #3 Exhibit A to Mullendore Decl)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 360 MOTION in Limine No. 6 re Importation filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 03:00 PM before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Genius Oppo, #2 Declaration of Mullendore ISO Genius Oppo, #3 Exhibit A to Mullendore Decl)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 359 MOTION in Limine No. 5 re Improper Expert Testimony filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 03:00 PM before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Genius Oppo, #2 Declaration of Mullendore ISO Genius Oppo, #3 Exhibit A to Mullendore Decl)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 358 Proposed Jury Instructions by Largan Precision Co, LTD Joint Proposed Jury Instructions. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 357 MOTION in Limine No. 4 for Invalidity Without a Technical Expert filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 03:00 PM before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Genius Oppo)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 356 MOTION in Limine No 3 re No Non-Infringing Designs filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 03:00 PM before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Genius Oppo, #2 Declaration of Mullendore ISO Genius Oppo, #3 Exhibit A to Mullendore Decl)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 355 MOTION in Limine No. 2 re Not Practicing the Patents-In-Suit filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 03:00 PM before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Genius Oppo, #2 Declaration of Mullendore ISO Genius Oppo, #3 Exhibit A to Mullendore Decl, #4 Exhibit B (Sealed) to Mullendore Decl)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 354 MOTION in Limine No 1 for U.S. Percentage of Products Containing Genius Lenses Differing from Worldwide Percentage filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 03:00 PM before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Genius Oppo, #2 Declaration of Mullendore ISO Genius Oppo, #3 Exhibit A to Mullendore Decl)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 353 Proposed Voir Dire by Largan Precision Co, LTD Joint Proposed Voir Dire. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 352 Exhibit List Joint Exhibit List by Largan Precision Co, LTD.. (Attachments: *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. *** #1 Exhibit A - Admissible Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B - Disputed Exhibits)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/18/2015) Modified on 3/11/2015 (fff, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2015 Filing 351 TRIAL BRIEF by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 350 Pretrial Conference Statement by Largan Precision Co, LTD Joint Pretrial Statement. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 349 TRIAL BRIEF by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 348 Declaration of Michael Engle in Support of Plaintiff Largan Precicion Co., Ltd.'s Oppositions [344-1], [345-1], [346-3], and [347-2] to Defendant Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.'s Motions In Limine filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21, #6 Exhibit 22, #7 Exhibit 23, #8 Exhibit 24, #9 Exhibit 25, #10 Exhibit 26, #11 Exhibit 27)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 347 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Preclude Documents Protected by the Work Product Doctrine filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Largan Opposition)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 346 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Certain Misleading and Prejudicial Evidence Regarding Plaintiff Largan Precision Co., Ltd.'s Alleged Practice of Unasserted Claims filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Largan Opposition)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 345 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Julie Bentley filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Largan Opposition)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 344 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Certain Irrelevant and Prejudicial Documents and Related Testimony Regarding 2011 Patent Assertion filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Largan Opposition)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 343 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #209 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales, #211 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper , #223 MOTION Preclude Certain Testimony of Gregory Swinehart , #224 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Willfullness, #214 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Infringement, #217 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Validity, #218 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper, #213 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Dr. George Barbastathis . Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 342 CLERK'S NOTICE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #331 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions to Add GS-8696, Bifurcate Issues Related to GS-8696, and Set an Expedited Schedule and Trial for the GS-8696. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #338 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alan M. Rabinowitz. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER re #305 Order Striking Administrative Motions to Seal. The parties should file any new motions to seal to replace the ones previously struck by the Court by 2/23/2015. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 339 NOTICE by Apple Inc. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL [GREGORY J. APGAR] (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 338 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice [Alan M. Rabinowitz] ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9291833.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Rabinowitz, Alan) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 337 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re Largan Reply ISO Mot for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 336 REPLY (re #331 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions to Add GS-8696, Bifurcate Issues Related to GS-8696, and Set an Expedited Schedule and Trial for the GS-8696 ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Julie Bentley ISO Reply - Redacted, #2 Declaration of John Esterhay ISO Reply, #3 Exhibit 4 to Esterhay Decl.)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 4, 2015 Filing 335 RESPONSE (re #331 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions to Add GS-8696, Bifurcate Issues Related to GS-8696, and Set an Expedited Schedule and Trial for the GS-8696 ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 334 USFC Notice of Docketing. Their case no. is 15-120.(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 333 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #331 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions to Add GS-8696, Bifurcate Issues Related to GS-8696, and Set an Expedited Schedule and Trial for the GS-8696. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 21, 2015 Filing 332 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #331 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions to Add GS-8696, Bifurcate Issues Related to GS-8696, and Set an Expedited Schedule and Trial for the GS-8696 (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 21, 2015 Filing 331 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions to Add GS-8696, Bifurcate Issues Related to GS-8696, and Set an Expedited Schedule and Trial for the GS-8696 filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 2/4/2015. Replies due by 2/11/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John D. Esterhay (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of John D. Esterhay (Redacted), #5 Proposed Order)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER moving pretrial conference date. In light of Largan's counsel's conflict with the pretrial conference date set in the Court's amended scheduling order #326 , the pretrial conference date is moved to 3/18/15 at 3:00 pm. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting stipulation to move pretrial dates. The due date for pretrial filings, the last day to meet and confer about deposition and discovery designations, and the deadline for deposition and discovery designations will be due in accordance with the Court's Standing Order on Civil Trials. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/13/2015. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 328 NOTICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #326 Case Management Scheduling Order,, Set Trial Management Order Deadlines, Notice of Conflict (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 327 STIPULATION re #326 Case Management Scheduling Order,, Set Trial Management Order Deadlines, filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 4/13/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato.. Signed by Judge 1/8/15 on 1/8/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #223 MOTION Preclude Certain Testimony of Gregory Swinehart , #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #211 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper , #209 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales, #224 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Willfullness, #214 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Infringement, #217 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Validity, #213 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Dr. George Barbastathis , #218 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper. Motions due by 3/11/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Jury Selection set for 4/6/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/8/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Order by Hon. James Donato denying #316 Motion for Stay of Order Granting Motion to Compel. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 6, 2015 Filing 323 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher Lane Reed (Reed, Kristopher) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
December 31, 2014 Filing 322 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Discovery Hearing held on 12/30/2014.(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/31/2014)
December 31, 2014 Filing 321 NOTICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. of Compliance with Court's December 30, 2014 Oral Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 31, 2014 Filing 320 MOTION to Continue Hearing filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Order by Hon. James Donato re #316 Motion for Stay of Order #295 and Leave to Submit Documents for In Camera Inspection. Lead counsel for both parties are ordered to appear for a telephone conference at 10:00 a.m. on 12/30/14 to discuss the motion. The parties are instructed to set up the conference call through CourtCall at (866) 582-6878. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2014)
December 26, 2014 Filing 318 RESPONSE (re #316 MOTION for Leave to File Submit Documents for In Camera Inspection and for Stay of Order (D.I. 295) ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph P. Reid ISO Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joseph P. Reid)(Reid, Joseph) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 26, 2014 Filing 317 Declaration of Jeffrey Connor in Support of #316 MOTION for Leave to File Submit Documents for In Camera Inspection and for Stay of Order (D.I. 295) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #316 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 24, 2014 Filing 316 MOTION for Leave to File Submit Documents for In Camera Inspection and for Stay of Order (D.I. 295) filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration C.J. Lin, #3 Declaration Kuo-Wen Chang, #4 Declaration Jeffrey M. Connor, #5 Exhibit A)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/24/2014)
December 24, 2014 Filing 315 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #309 Reply to Opposition/Response,, #308 Reply to Opposition/Response, #306 Reply to Opposition/Response, #310 Reply to Opposition/Response, #313 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/24/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 314 REPLY (re #218 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 313 REPLY (re #214 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Infringement ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay ISO Reply, #2 Exhibit 53 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit 54 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 55 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit 56 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 57 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit 58 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit 59 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit 60 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit 61 (Sealed))(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 312 REPLY (re #209 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #2 Exhibit A)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 311 REPLY (re #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 310 REPLY (re #223 MOTION Preclude Certain Testimony of Gregory Swinehart ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle ISO Reply Daubert-Swinehart, #2 Exhibit 6 (SEALED), #3 Exhibit 7 (SEALED), #4 Exhibit 8 (SEALED), #5 Exhibit 9 (SEALED))(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 309 REPLY (re #224 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Willfullness ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay ISO Reply, #2 Exhibit 47 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit 48 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 49 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit 50 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 51 (Sealed), #7 Exhibit 52 (Sealed), #8 Exhibit 53 (Sealed), #9 Exhibit 54 (Sealed), #10 Exhibit 55 (Sealed), #11 Exhibit 56 (Sealed), #12 Exhibit 57 (Sealed))(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 308 REPLY (re #217 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Validity ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle ISO Reply, #2 Exhibit 16, #3 Exhibit 17 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Exhibit 19, #6 Exhibit 20, #7 Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit 22, #9 Exhibit 23 (Sealed))(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 307 REPLY (re #211 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Filing 306 REPLY (re #213 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Dr. George Barbastathis ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle ISO Reply, #2 Exhibit 17 ISO Reply (Redacted))(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER STRIKING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 304 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Discovery Letter Brief filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #273 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 303 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 2, 4, 6, 8, 10, 12, 14, 16, 18, 20, 22, 24, 26, 28, 30, and 32 to #302 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #290 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oppositions to Genius's Motion for Summary Judgment, Daubert Motions, and Motion to Strike and supporting exhibits by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 20, #11 Exhibit 22, #12 Exhibit 24, #13 Exhibit 26, #14 Exhibit 28, #15 Exhibit 30, #16 Exhibit 32)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 302 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #290 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oppositions to Genius's Motion for Summary Judgment, Daubert Motions, and Motion to Strike and supporting exhibits filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Exhibit 19, #11 Exhibit 21, #12 Exhibit 23, #13 Exhibit 25, #14 Exhibit 27, #15 Exhibit 29, #16 Exhibit 31)(Related document(s) #290 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 301 Declaration of Gregory J. Apgar in Support of #293 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT DEFENDANT GENIUS HAS WILLFULLY INFRINGED THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #293 ) (Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 300 Declaration of Gregory J. Apgar in Support of #290 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oppositions to Genius's Motion for Summary Judgment, Daubert Motions, and Motion to Strike and supporting exhibits filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #290 ) (Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 299 Declaration of Gregory J. Apgar in Support of #287 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE CERTAIN TESTIMONY OF GREGORY SWINEHART filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #287 ) (Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 298 Declaration of Gregory J. Apgar in Support of #283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE CERTAIN TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF DR. GEORGE BARBASTATHIS filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #283 ) (Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 297 Declaration of Gregory J. Apgar in Support of #281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ACCUSED PRODUCTS INFRINGE THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #281 ) (Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 296 EXHIBITS re #293 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT DEFENDANT GENIUS HAS WILLFULLY INFRINGED THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT, #281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ACCUSED PRODUCTS INFRINGE THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN, #287 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE CERTAIN TESTIMONY OF GREGORY SWINEHART, #285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS, #283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE CERTAIN TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF DR. GEORGE BARBASTATHIS filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt 281-7 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit Dkt 281-7 (Unredacted), #3 Exhibit Dkt. 281-8 (Public), #4 Exhibit Dkt. 281-9 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit Dkt 281-9 (Unredacted), #6 Exhibit Dkt 283-3 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit Dkt 283-3 (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit Dkt 285-4 (Public), #9 Exhibit Dkt 285-5 (Public), #10 Exhibit Dkt 285-6 (Public), #11 Exhibit Dkt 285-7 (Public), #12 Exhibit Dkt 287-4 (Redacted), #13 Exhibit Dkt 287-4 (Unredacted), #14 Exhibit Dkt 287-5 (Redacted), #15 Exhibit Dkt 287-5 (Unredacted), #16 Exhibit Dkt 293-11 (Redacted), #17 Exhibit Dkt 291-11 (Unredacted))(Related document(s) #293 , #281 , #287 , #285 , #283 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting in part #274 Motion to Compel. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2014)
December 19, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2014 10:00 AM before James Donato. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to schedule their appearance before the Court for the hearing. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Order by Hon. James Donato denying #268 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of #208 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Strike Barbastathis Expert Report. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 293 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT DEFENDANT GENIUS HAS WILLFULLY INFRINGED THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 292 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #290 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oppositions to Genius's Motion for Summary Judgment, Daubert Motions, and Motion to Strike and supporting exhibits (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 291 RESPONSE (re #224 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Willfullness ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 290 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oppositions to Genius's Motion for Summary Judgment, Daubert Motions, and Motion to Strike and supporting exhibits filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Daubert Brief re Napper Reasonable Royalties (Redacted), #4 Exhibit Daubert Brief re Napper Reasonable Royalties (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit A to Daubert re Napper Reasonable Royalties (Redacted), #6 Exhibit A to Daubert re Napper Reasonable (Unedacted), #7 Exhibit Daubert Brief re Napper Worldwide Sales (Redacted), #8 Exhibit Daubert Brief re Napper Worldwide Sales (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit A to Daubert re Napper Worldwide Sales (Sealed), #10 Exhibit A to Opposition to Motion to Strike (Sealed), #11 Exhibit B to Opposition to Motion to Strike (Unredacted), #12 Exhibit B to Opposition to Motion to Strike (Redacted), #13 Exhibit C to Opposition to Motion to Strike (Sealed), #14 Exhibit F to Opposition to Motion to Strike (Sealed), #15 Exhibit G to Opposition to Motion to Strike (Sealed), #16 Exhibit H to Opposition to Motion to Strike (Sealed), #17 Exhibit I to Opposition to Motion to Strike (Unredacted), #18 Exhibit I to Opposition to Motion to Strike (Redacted), #19 Exhibit J to Opposition to Motion to Strike (Sealed), #20 Exhibit K to Opposition to Motion to Strike (Sealed), #21 Exhibit Opposition to MSJ Brief (Unredacted), #22 Exhibit Opposition to MSJ Brief (Redacted), #23 Exhibit Declaration to Opposition to MSJ (Unredacted), #24 Exhibit Opposition to MSJ Brief (Redacted), #25 Exhibit A to Opposition to MSJ Brief (Sealed), #26 Exhibit B to Opposition to MSJ Brief (Sealed), #27 Exhibit C to Opposition to MSJ Brief (Sealed), #28 Exhibit D to Opposition to MSJ Brief (Sealed), #29 Exhibit E to Opposition to MSJ Brief (Sealed), #30 Exhibit F to Opposition to MSJ Brief (Sealed), #31 Exhibit G to Opposition to MSJ Brief (Sealed), #32 Exhibit I to Opposition to MSJ Brief (Sealed), #33 Exhibit K to Opposition to MSJ Brief (Unredacted), #34 Exhibit K to Opposition to MSJ Brief (Redacted))(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 289 RESPONSE (re #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Engle ISO Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to Engle Decl, #3 Exhibit B to Engle Decl, #4 Exhibit C to Engle Decl, #5 Exhibit D to Engle Decl, #6 Exhibit E to Engle Decl, #7 Exhibit F to Engle Decl, #8 Exhibit G to Engle Decl, #9 Exhibit H to Engle Decl, #10 Exhibit I to Engle Decl, #11 Exhibit J to Engle Decl, #12 Exhibit K to Engle Decl, #13 Proposed Order Denying Genius NonInfringement MSJ)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 288 RESPONSE (re #218 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian W. Napper, #2 Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #3 Exhibit A (Sealed), #4 Exhibit B (Redacted), #5 Exhibit C (Sealed), #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F (Sealed), #9 Exhibit G (Sealed), #10 Exhibit H (Sealed), #11 Exhibit I (Redacted), #12 Exhibit J (Cover), #13 Exhibit K (Cover), #14 Proposed Order)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 287 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE CERTAIN TESTIMONY OF GREGORY SWINEHART filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 - Redacted version of Opposition, #4 Exhibit 2 - Unredacted version of Opposition, #5 Exhibit 3 - Unredacted version of Exhibit A)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 286 RESPONSE (re #223 MOTION Preclude Certain Testimony of Gregory Swinehart ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT ARE NOT INVALID AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1- Redacted Version of Opposition, #4 Exhibit 2- Unredacted Version of Opposition, #5 Exhibit 3- Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit 4- Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit 5- Unredacted Version of Exhibit G)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 284 RESPONSE (re #217 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Validity ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE CERTAIN TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF DR. GEORGE BARBASTATHIS filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 - Unredacted version of Exhibit A)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 282 RESPONSE (re #213 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Dr. George Barbastathis ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE ACCUSED PRODUCTS INFRINGE THE ASSERTED CLAIMS OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1- Redacted Version of Opposition, #4 Exhibit 2- Unredacted Version of Opposition, #5 Exhibit 3- Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit 4- Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit 5- Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit 6- Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit 7- Unredacted Version of Exhibit E)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 280 RESPONSE (re #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 279 RESPONSE (re #209 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #2 Exhibit A (Sealed), #3 Proposed Order)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 278 RESPONSE (re #211 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper ) on Reasonable Royalties filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #2 Exhibit A (Redacted) to Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #4 Proposed Order)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Order re discovery letter brief #274 . By 10:00 a.m. on 12/17/14, Largan will identify to Genius each document whose privilege or work product status it disputes. By the end of the day on 12/17/14, Genius will lodge with the Court (but not file) paper copies of each of the documents identified by Largan, along with the rows from its privilege logs related to those documents, for in camera review by the Court. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Filing 275 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Discovery Letter Brief (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Filing 274 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Genius filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schnurer, John) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Filing 273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Discovery Letter Brief filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay ISO Admin Mot to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A (Sealed), #4 Exhibit B (Sealed))(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 272 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #241 Declaration in Support, #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits [NON-PARTY APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATION OF ASHUTOSH UPRETI IN SUPPORT OF DOCKET ENTRIES 220 AND 241] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ashutosh Upreti)(Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 271 Declaration of Gregory J. Apgar in Support of #241 Declaration in Support, #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #241 , #220 ) (Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Order terminating #267 Motion for Leave to File entered by Hon. James Donato. The motion is terminated pursuant to Dkt. No. 269. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER re #267 MOTION for Leave to File on Attorney Work Product and #266 Letter Brief filed by Genius Electronic Optical. The Court denies the motion and letter brief as moot based on Genius's representation that it has complied with the Court's December 5, 2014, production order re C.J. Lin. If Largan seeks other documents for which Genius asserts work product objections, the burden is on Largan to move to compel production pursuant to the Court's standing order on discovery. The Court expects that this will not delay the depositions the Court previously ordered. (Donato, James) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 268 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Courts Order Dated December 5, 2014 (D.I. 208) Granting Largans Motion to Strike Certain Invalidity Opinions filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #8 Proposed Order)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 267 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Dated December 5, 2014 (D.I. 207) on Attorney Work Product filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 266 Letter Brief re #207 Discovery Hearing, Order on Discovery Letter Brief,,,,, filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #207 ) (Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 265 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits DH and DJ to #241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DH - part 2 of 4, #2 Exhibit DH - part 3 of 4, #3 Exhibit DH - part 4 of 4, #4 Exhibit DJ)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 264 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits DG and DI filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DG - part 2 of 3, #2 Exhibit DG - part 3 of 3, #3 Exhibit DI)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 263 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits CT, CV, CX, CZ, DB, DD, and DF to #241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV, #2 Exhibit CX, #3 Exhibit CZ, #4 Exhibit DB, #5 Exhibit DD, #6 Exhibit DF)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 262 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits CS, CU, CW, CY, DA, DC, and DE filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CU, #2 Exhibit CW, #3 Exhibit CY - part 1 of 2, #4 Exhibit CY - part 2 of 2, #5 Exhibit DA, #6 Exhibit DC, #7 Exhibit DE)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 261 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits CG, CI, CJ, CL, CN, CP, and CR to #241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CI, #2 Exhibit CJ, #3 Exhibit CL, #4 Exhibit CN, #5 Exhibit CP, #6 Exhibit CR)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 260 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits CB, CD, CF, CH, CK, CM, CO, and CQ filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CD, #2 Exhibit CF, #3 Exhibit CH, #4 Exhibit CK, #5 Exhibit CM, #6 Exhibit CO, #7 Exhibit CQ)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 259 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits BQ, BS, BU, BW, BY, CA, CC, and CE to #241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BS, #2 Exhibit BU, #3 Exhibit BW, #4 Exhibit BY, #5 Exhibit CA, #6 Exhibit CC, #7 Exhibit CE)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 258 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits BP, BR, BT, BV, BX, and BZ filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BR, #2 Exhibit BT, #3 Exhibit BV, #4 Exhibit BX, #5 Exhibit BZ)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 257 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits BI, BK, BM, and BO to #241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BK, #2 Exhibit BM, #3 Exhibit BO)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 256 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits BH, BJ, BL, and BN filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BH - part 2 of 6, #2 Exhibit BH - part 3 of 6, #3 Exhibit BH - part 4 of 6, #4 Exhibit BH - part 5 of 6, #5 Exhibit BH - part 6 of 6, #6 Exhibit BJ, #7 Exhibit BL, #8 Exhibit BN)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 255 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits BA, BC, BE, and BG to #241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BA - part 2 of 4, #2 Exhibit BA - part 3 of 4, #3 Exhibit BA - part 4 of 4, #4 Exhibit BC, #5 Exhibit BE, #6 Exhibit BG)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 254 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits BB, BD, and BF filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BD, #2 Exhibit BF)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 253 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits AX and AZ filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AZ - part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit AZ - part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit AZ - part 3 of 3)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 252 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits AQ, AS, AU, AW, and AY to #241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AS, #2 Exhibit AU, #3 Exhibit AW, #4 Exhibit AY)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 251 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits AP, AR, AT, and AV filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AR, #2 Exhibit AT, #3 Exhibit AV - part 1 of 2, #4 Exhibit AV - part 2 of 2)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 250 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits AE, AG, AH, AI, AK, AM, and AO to #241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AG, #2 Exhibit AH, #3 Exhibit AI, #4 Exhibit AK, #5 Exhibit AM, #6 Exhibit AO)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 249 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits AF, AJ, AL, and AN filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AJ, #2 Errata AL, #3 Exhibit AN)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 248 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits U, W, Y, AA, and AC to #241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit W, #2 Exhibit Y, #3 Exhibit AA, #4 Exhibit AC)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 247 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits V, X, Z, AB, and AD filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit X, #2 Exhibit Z, #3 Exhibit AB, #4 Exhibit AD)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 246 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits L, M, N, O, Q, and S to #241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M, #2 Exhibit N, #3 Exhibit O, #4 Exhibit Q, #5 Exhibit S)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 245 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits K, P, R, and T filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P, #2 Exhibit R, #3 Exhibit T)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 244 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits B, D, F, H, and J to #241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit J)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 243 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibit I filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - part 2 of 6, #2 Exhibit I - part 3 of 6, #3 Errata I - part 4 of 6, #4 Errata I - part 5 of 6, #5 Errata I - part 6 of 6)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 242 EXHIBITS re #241 Declaration in Support, Exhibits A, C, E, and G filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 241 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #220 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 240 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits [NON-PARTY APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATION OF ASHUTOSH UPRETI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ashutosh Upreti)(Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 239 Declaration of Gregory J. Apgar in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #220 ) (Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 238 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement NON-PARTY APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATION OF ASHUTOSH UPRETI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ashutosh Upreti)(Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 237 Declaration of Gregory J. Apgar in Support of #216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #216 ) (Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 236 Declaration of Gregory J. Apgar in Support of #219 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #219 ) (Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 235 Declaration of Gregory J. Apgar in Support of #212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #212 ) (Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 234 Declaration of Gregory J. Apgar in Support of #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #210 ) (Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 233 EXHIBITS re #216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #219 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper, #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales, #212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 219-4 (redacted), #2 Exhibit 219-4 (unredacted), #3 Exhibit 219-5 (unredacted), #4 Exhibit 219-5 (redacted), #5 Exhibit 219-6 (unredacted), #6 Exhibit 219-6 (redacted), #7 Exhibit 219-7 (unredacted), #8 Exhibit 219-7 (redacted), #9 Exhibit 210-4 (unredacted), #10 Exhibit 210-4 (redacted), #11 Exhibit 210-5 (unredacted), #12 Exhibit 210-5 (redacted), #13 Exhibit 210-6 (unredacted), #14 Exhibit 210-6 (redacted), #15 Exhibit 212-4 (unredacted), #16 Exhibit 212-4 (redacted), #17 Exhibit 212-5 (unredacted), #18 Exhibit 212-5 (redacted), #19 Exhibit 212-6 (unredacted), #20 Exhibit 212-6 (redacted), #21 Exhibit 212-7 (unredacted), #22 Exhibit 212-7 (redacted), #23 Exhibit 216-4 (unredacted), #24 Exhibit 216-4 (redacted), #25 Exhibit 216-8 (unredacted), #26 Exhibit 216-8 (redacted), #27 Exhibit 216-9 (public), #28 Exhibit 216-15 (unredacted), #29 Exhibit 216-15 (redacted))(Related document(s) #216 , #219 , #210 , #212 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 232 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 231 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 230 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 229 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 228 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #219 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 8, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #213 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Dr. George Barbastathis . Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato.THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 227 CLERK'S NOTICE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #224 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Willfullness, #214 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Infringement, #217 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Validity, #223 MOTION Preclude Certain Testimony of Gregory Swinehart , #215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, #213 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Dr. George Barbastathis . Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014) Modified on 12/8/2014 (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2014 Filing 226 EXHIBITS re #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Willfullness MSJ Brief, #2 Exhibit 1-1 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #3 Exhibit 1-2 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #4 Exhibit 2 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #5 Exhibit 3 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #6 Exhibit 4 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #7 Exhibit 5 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #8 Exhibit 6 (unredacted) to Willfullness MSJ, #9 Exhibit 6 (redacted) to Willfullness MSJ, #10 Exhibit 7 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #11 Exhibit 8 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #12 Exhibit 9 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #13 Exhibit 10 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #14 Exhibit 17 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #15 Exhibit 18 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #16 Exhibit 19 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #17 Exhibit 20 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #18 Exhibit 21 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #19 Exhibit 22-1 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #20 Exhibit 22-2 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #21 Exhibit 24 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #22 Exhibit 25 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #23 Exhibit 26 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #24 Exhibit 27 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #25 Exhibit 28 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #26 Exhibit 29 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #27 Exhibit 30 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #28 Exhibit 31 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #29 Exhibit 32 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #30 Exhibit 33 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #31 Exhibit 34 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #32 Exhibit 35 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #33 Exhibit 36 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #34 Exhibit 37 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #35 Exhibit 38 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #36 Exhibit 39 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #37 Exhibit 40 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #38 Exhibit 41 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #39 Exhibit 42 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #40 Exhibit 43 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #41 Exhibit 44 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #42 Exhibit 45 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ, #43 Exhibit 46 (sealed) to Willfullness MSJ)(Related document(s) #220 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/6/2014)
December 6, 2014 Filing 225 EXHIBITS re #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Swinehart Daubert Brief, #2 Exhibit 1-1 (sealed) to Swinehart Daubert, #3 Exhibit 1-2 (sealed) to Swinehart Daubert, #4 Exhibit 2 (sealed) to Swinehart Daubert, #5 Exhibit 3 (sealed) to Swinehart Daubert, #6 Exhibit 4 (sealed) to Swinehart Daubert, #7 Exhibit 5 (sealed) to Swinehart Daubert)(Related document(s) #220 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/6/2014)
December 6, 2014 Filing 224 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Willfullness filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 12/17/2014. Replies due by 12/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of John D. Esterhay ISO MSJ - Willfulness, #2 Exhibit 1-5 to Esterhay Decl., #3 Exhibit 8-10 to Esterhay Decl., #4 Exhibit 11 to Esterhay Decl., #5 Exhibit 12 to Esterhay Decl., #6 Exhibit 13 to Esterhay Decl., #7 Exhibit 14 to Esterhay Decl., #8 Exhibit 15 to Esterhay Decl., #9 Exhibit 16 to Esterhay Decl., #10 Exhibit 17-20 to Esterhay Decl., #11 Exhibit 21, 22, 24, 25, 26, 27, 28, 29, 30 to Esterhay Decl., #12 Exhibit 31-40 to Esterhay Decl., #13 Exhibit 41-46 to Esterhay Decl., #14 Declaration of Dr. Bentley ISO MSJ - Willfulness, #15 Exhibit 6 to Bentley Decl., #16 Exhibit 7 to Bentley Decl., #17 Proposed Order)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/6/2014)
December 6, 2014 Filing 223 MOTION Preclude Certain Testimony of Gregory Swinehart filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 12/17/2014. Replies due by 12/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle, #2 Exhibit 1 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit 2 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 3 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit 4 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 5 (Sealed), #7 Proposed Order)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 12/6/2014)
December 6, 2014 Filing 222 EXHIBITS re #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Infringement MSJ Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #3 Exhibit 2 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #4 Exhibit 3 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #5 Exhibit 4 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #6 Exhibit 5 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #7 Exhibit 6 (redacted) to Infringement MSJ, #8 Exhibit 6 (uredacted) to Infringement MSJ, #9 Exhibit 7 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #10 Exhibit 8 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #11 Exhibit 9 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #12 Exhibit 10 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #13 Exhibit 11 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #14 Exhibit 12 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #15 Exhibit 13 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #16 Exhibit 14 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #17 Exhibit 15 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #18 Exhibit 16 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #19 Exhibit 17 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #20 Exhibit 18 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #21 Exhibit 19 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #22 Exhibit 20 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #23 Exhibit 21 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #24 Exhibit 22 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #25 Exhibit 23 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #26 Exhibit 24 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #27 Exhibit 25 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #28 Exhibit 26 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #29 Exhibit 27 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #30 Exhibit 28 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #31 Exhibit 29 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #32 Exhibit 30 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #33 Exhibit 31 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #34 Exhibit 32 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #35 Exhibit 33 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #36 Exhibit 34 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #37 Exhibit 35 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #38 Exhibit 36 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #39 Exhibit 37 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #40 Exhibit 38 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #41 Exhibit 39 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #42 Exhibit 40 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #43 Exhibit 41 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #44 Exhibit 42 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #45 Exhibit 43 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #46 Exhibit 44 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #47 Exhibit 45 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #48 Exhibit 46 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #49 Exhibit 47 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #50 Exhibit 48 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #51 Exhibit 49 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #52 Exhibit 50 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #53 Exhibit 51 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ, #54 Exhibit 52 (sealed) to Infringement MSJ)(Related document(s) #220 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/6/2014)
December 6, 2014 Filing 221 EXHIBITS re #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Barbastathis Daubert Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 (sealed) to Barbastathis Daubert, #3 Exhibit 3 (redacted) to Barbastathis Daubert, #4 Exhibit 3 (unredacted) to Barbastathis Daubert, #5 Exhibit 4 (sealed) to Barbastathis Daubert, #6 Exhibit 5 (sealed) to Barbastathis Daubert, #7 Exhibit 15 (sealed) to Barbastathis Daubert, #8 Exhibit 16 (sealed) to Barbastathis Daubert)(Related document(s) #220 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/6/2014)
December 6, 2014 Filing 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motions and Motions for Summary Judgment and Supporting Exhibits filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 6 (redacted) to Validity MSJ, #4 Exhibit 6 (unredacted) to Validity MSJ, #5 Exhibit 7 (sealed) to Validity MSJ, #6 Exhibit Redacted Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Validity, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Validity)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/6/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 219 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 218 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 12/19/2014. Replies due by 12/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 217 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Validity filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 12/17/2014. Replies due by 12/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Engle, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Dr. Julie Bentley, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6 (redacted), #10 Exhibit 7 (sealed), #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, *** #14 Exhibit 12 DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/5/2014) Modified on 12/10/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2014 Filing 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 12/19/2014. Replies due by 12/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, *** #12 Exhibit H DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/5/2014) Modified on 12/10/2014 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2014 Filing 214 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Infringement filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 12/17/2014. Replies due by 12/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of John D. Esterhay ISO MSJ - Infringement, #2 Exhibit 1-5 to Esterhay Decl., #3 Exhibit 7-15 to Esterhay Decl., #4 Exhibit 16-25 to Esterhay Decl., #5 Exhibit 26-35 to Esterhay Decl., #6 Exhibit 36-45 to Esterhay Decl., #7 Exhibit 46-52 to Esterhay Decl., #8 Declaration of Dr. Bentley ISO MSJ - Infringement, #9 Exhibit 6 to Bentley Decl, #10 Proposed Order Granting MSJ - Infringement)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 213 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Testimony and Opinions of Dr. George Barbastathis filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 12/17/2014. Replies due by 12/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 4 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit 5 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15 (Sealed), #16 Exhibit 16 (Sealed), #17 Declaration Julie Bentley, #18 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #19 Proposed Order)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Laura K. Mullendore, #3 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Version of Daubert Motion, #4 Exhibit 2 - Unredacted Version of Daubert Motion, #5 Exhibit 3 - Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit 4- Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit 5 - Unredacted Version of Exhibit C)(Connor, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 211 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 12/19/2014. Replies due by 12/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Laura K. Mullendore, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Connor, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 209 MOTION Daubert Motion to Preclude Certain Opinions of Brian W. Napper Regarding Worldwide Sales filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 12/19/2014. Replies due by 12/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part #172 Motion to Strike Expert Report of George Barbastathis and denying #177 Motion to Strike Expert Report of Julie Bentley. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 207 Minute Entry: Telephonic discovery hearing held on 12/5/2014. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 206 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief re Largan Precision Co., Ltd.'s October 24, 2014 Discovery Letter Brief re Discovery Disputes with Genius #150 filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #200 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Todd M. Friedman. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #201 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory J. Apgar. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 2, 2014 Filing 203 CLERK'S NOTICE Telephone Discovery Hearing set for 12/5/2014 at 10:30 AM before Hon. James Donato. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to schedule their appearance before the Court for the hearing. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 202 Declaration of Brian W. Lee in Support of #193 Declaration in Support, #185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Genius Motion to Strike and Supporting Exhibits filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #193 , #185 ) (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Hearing previously set for 12/5/2014 at 2:00 PM is moved to 12/5/2014 at 10:30 AM before Hon. James Donato. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 201 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice [Gregory J. Apgar] ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9108070.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Apgar, Gregory) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 200 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice [Todd M. Friedman] ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9107994.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Order re Telephonic Discovery Hearing. The motions to strike the expert reports of George Barbastathis #172 and Julie Bentley #177 will be discussed at the hearing scheduled for 12/5/2014. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/01/2014. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 198 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #193 Declaration in Support, #197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Replace Incorrectly Filed Public Version, #194 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Replace Incorrectly Filed Public Version filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 196 Declaration of Brian W. Lee in Support of #189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Genius Reply in Support of Motion to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #189 ) (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 195 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Genius Motion to Strike and Supporting Exhibits - Stipulated Motion and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline to File Declaration Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5 filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Mullendore)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 194 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Versions of Largan's Opposition to Genius's Motion to Strike Expert Report of Bentley and Exhibits 4, 5, 6, 8 & 10 Thereto with Proposed Redactions Highlighted as Ordered by Court by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to #193 Mullendore Decl., #2 Exhibit D to #193 Mullendore Decl., #3 Exhibit F to #193 Mullendore Decl., #4 Exhibit H to #193 Mullendore Decl., #5 Exhibit J to #193 Mullendore Decl., #6 Exhibit L to #193 Mullendore Decl.)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 193 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Genius Motion to Strike and Supporting Exhibits filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #185 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #191 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Close of Expert Discovery. Expert discovery is extended solely for the purpose of permitting the deposition of Brian Napper on 12/5/14. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 191 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #77 Order on Stipulation Stipulated Motion and [Proposed] Order to Extend the Close of Expert Discovery to Conduct the Deposition of Brian Napper filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Connor in Support of Stipulated Motion to Extend the Close of Expert Discovery to Conduct the Deposition of Brian Napper)(Connor, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 24, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 12/5/2014 at 2:00 PM re #149 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery from Apple Inc., #150 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery from Genius. The parties and non-party Apple are instructed to contact CourtCall at 877-851-4102 to schedule their telephonic appearance before this Court. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 190 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Genius Reply in Support of Motion to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Genius Reply in Support of Motion to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 188 REPLY (re #177 MOTION to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Genius Motion to Strike and Supporting Exhibits (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 18, 2014 Filing 186 RESPONSE (re #177 MOTION to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 18, 2014 Filing 185 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Genius Motion to Strike and Supporting Exhibits filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Largan Opposition to Genius Motion to Strike - unredacted, #4 Exhibit Largan Opposition to Genius Motion to Strike - redacted, #5 Exhibit 4 - sealed, #6 Exhibit 5 - unredacted, #7 Exhibit 5 - redacted, #8 Exhibit 6 - sealed, #9 Exhibit 7 - unredacted, #10 Exhibit 7 - redacted, #11 Exhibit 8 - sealed, #12 Exhibit 9 - sealed, #13 Exhibit 10 - sealed, #14 Exhibit 11 - unredacted, #15 Exhibit 11 - redacted)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 18, 2014 Filing 184 Declaration of Brian W. Lee in Support of #179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Genius Motion to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #179 ) (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 18, 2014 Filing 183 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Mullendore Decl. ISO Genius's Motion to Strike filed under seal with proposed redactions highlighted as ordered by Court by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 18, 2014 Filing 182 Declaration of John D. Esterhay in Support of #179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Genius Motion to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Laura Mullendore ISO Genius Motion to Strike (Redacted))(Related document(s) #179 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 17, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #177 MOTION to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley. Responses due by 11/20/2014. Replies due by 11/21/2014. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #178 Motion to Expedite Briefing re #177 Motion to Strike Expert Report of Julie Bentley. Largan's response to the motion will be due 11/20/14 and Genius's reply will be due 11/21/14. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014) Modified on 11/17/2014 (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2014 Filing 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Genius Motion to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Genius Motion to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 178 MOTION to Expedite Genius Motion to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Jeffrey Connor)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 177 MOTION to Strike in Part Expert Report of Julie Bentley filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 12/24/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 11/28/2014. Replies due by 12/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 176 REPLY (re #172 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of George Barbastathis ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 175 RESPONSE (re #172 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of George Barbastathis ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Sipiora, David) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 10, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #172 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of George Barbastathis. Responses due by 11/13/2014. Replies due by 11/14/2014. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting in part #173 Largan's Motion to Change Time Regarding its Motion to Strike Expert Report. Genius's response to #172 Motion to Strike Expert Report will be due 11/13/14. Largan's reply will be due 11/14/14. The motion hearing set for 12/17/14 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 173 MOTION to Expedite Largan Motion to Strike (D.I. 172) filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay ISO Largan Motion to Change Time, #2 Proposed Order Granting Largan Motion to Change Time)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 172 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of George Barbastathis filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 11/21/2014. Replies due by 12/1/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay ISO Largan Motion to Strike, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike, #3 Exhibit 1-1, #4 Exhibit 1-2, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 171 REDACTION to #117 Discovery Letter Brief, re #160 Order, Documents Unredacted as Ordered by Court by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 170 REDACTION to #106 Opposition/Response to Motion, re #160 Order, Documents Unredacted as Ordered by Court by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 22)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 169 REDACTION to #85 Opposition/Response to Motion,, re #160 Order, Documents Unredacted as Ordered by Court by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Matthew Bone, #2 Declaration Laura Mullendore, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 16)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 168 EXHIBITS re #160 Order Documents Unredacted as Ordered by Court filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 to Largan Reply, #2 Exhibit 15 to Largan Reply, #3 Exhibit 17 to Largan Reply, #4 Exhibit 18 to Largan Reply, #5 Exhibit 24 to Largan Admin Motion to File Under Seal, #6 Exhibit Largan Admin Motion to Add Genius Lens, #7 Exhibit Largan Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, #8 Exhibit Largan Reply ISO Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions)(Related document(s) #160 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 7, 2014 Filing 167 EXHIBITS re #160 Order Documents Redacted as Ordered by Court filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit 22, #9 Exhibit 23)(Related document(s) #160 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 166 Counter Discovery Letter Brief in Response to Largan Precision Co., Ltd.'s October 24, 2014 Discovery Letter Brief re Discovery Disputes with Genius #150 filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 165 Discovery Letter Brief in Response to Plaintiff Largan Precision Co., Ltd.'s October 24, 2014 Discovery Letter Brief (D.I. 149) filed by Apple Inc.. (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 164 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/16/2014, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Pence, Telephone number (619) 587-0173, james_pence@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #157 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2015. (Related documents(s) #157 ) (Pence, James) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 163 Counter Discovery Letter Brief in Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery From Apple #149 filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Bishop, Gregory) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 3, 2014 Filing 162 Declaration of Laura K. Mullendore in Support of #154 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Replace Incorrectly Filed Public Versions filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #154 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
November 3, 2014 Filing 161 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 11/3/2014 before James Donato (Date Filed: 11/3/2014). () (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/3/2014)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Order granting in part motions to file under seal. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/31/2014. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 11/3/2014 11:00 am before Hon. James Donato re #151 , #156 . Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 877-851-4102 to schedule their telephonic appearance before this Court. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Order re discovery letter briefs #149 and #150 . Non-party Apple will file a response to discovery letter brief #149 by November 5, 2014, and Genius will file a response to discovery letter brief #150 by November 5, 2014. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 158 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Largan Precision Co, LTD for Court Reporter James Pence. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 157 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. for Court Reporter James Pence. (Sipiora, David) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 156 RESPONSE (re #151 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery With Regard to Non-Party Motorola ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura K. Mullendore, #2 Proposed Order)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #154 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Replace Incorrectly Filed Public Versions (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 154 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Replace Incorrectly Filed Public Versions filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay ISO Largan Admin. Motion to Seal Discovery Letter Brief and Motion to Extend and Replace Incorrectly filed Public Versions, #2 Proposed Order Granting Largan's Admin. Motion to Seal Discovery Letter Biref and Motion to Extend and Replace Incorrectly filed Public Versions, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Discovery Letter Brief, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Discovery Letter Brief, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Largan Admin. Motion for a Limited Extension of Discovery re Non-Party Motorola Mobility LLC, #6 Exhibit Unedacted Version of Largan Admin. Motion for a Limited Extension of Discovery re Non-Party Motorola Mobility LLC, #7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Declaration of John D. Esterhay ISO Largan Admin Motion for a Limited Extension of Discovery re Non-Party Motorola Mobility LLC, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Declaration of John D. Esterhay ISO Largan Admin Motion for a Limited Extension of Discovery re Non-Party Motorola Mobility LLC)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 153 CASE REFERRED to Mediation., CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Order by Hon. James Donato entering #146 stipulation selecting mediation. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 151 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery With Regard to Non-Party Motorola filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 150 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Discovery from Genius filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 149 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Discovery from Apple Inc. filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schnurer, John) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 148 Third Discovery Letter Brief filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #140 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #138 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #141 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #139 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #136 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #137 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NON-PARTY APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATION OF AYUSH MANU (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ayush Manu)(Lee, Brian) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 146 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Largan Precision Co, LTD filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 23, 2014 Filing 145 RESPONSE to re #140 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #138 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #135 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #141 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #139 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #136 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #137 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Sipiora, David) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 144 EXHIBITS re #133 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unsealed Exhibit 2 to 2014-05-13 Largan Discovery Letter Brief filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Related document(s) #133 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 143 Minute Entry: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 10/16/2014 before James Donato (Date Filed: 10/21/2014). (Court Reporter JAMES PENCE.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/20/2014. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part #118 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part #114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part #107 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part #101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part #90 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part #86 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part #78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #70 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Order by Hon. James Donato denying #52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 16, 2014 Filing 132 Discovery Letter Brief Response re Depositions filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 131 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/2/2014, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Pence, Telephone number (619) 587-0173, e-mail: james_pence@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #122 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2015. (Related documents(s) #122 ) (Pence, James) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 130 Second Discovery Letter Brief filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Sipiora, David) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re claim construction hearing. For the benefit of the court reporter, the parties are directed to prepare a joint list of specialized or technical terms that may be used at the claim construction hearing on October 16, 2014, which the parties are to provide to the court reporter at the beginning of the hearing. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 14, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #117 Discovery Letter Brief, #115 Discovery Letter Brief. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 128 Declaration of Brian W. Lee in Support of #118 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #118 ) (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 127 Declaration of Brian W. Lee in Support of #124 Declaration in Support, #114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #124 , #114 ) (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order re discovery letter brief #115 filed by Largan and discovery letter brief #117 filed by Genius. The Court will resolve the discovery dispute in the letter briefs at the claim construction hearing set for October 16, 2014, at 2:00 pm. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #124 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff Largan Precision Co., Ltd's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 124 Declaration of Laura K. Mullendore in Support of #114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #114 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Largan Precision Co, LTD for Court Reporter James Pence. (Reid, Joseph) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. for Court Reporter James Pence. (Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Largan Precision Co, LTD for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Reid, Joseph) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 120 Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 10/2/2014 before James Donato (Date Filed: 10/7/2014). (Court Reporter JAMES PENCE.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #118 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Sipiora, David) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 118 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit B - Redacted Discovery Letter, #4 Exhibit C - UNREDACTED Discovery Letter, #5 Exhibit D - Redacted Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit E - UNREDACTED Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit F - Redacted Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit G - UNREDACTED Exhibit B)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 117 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Discovery Letter Brief - Redacted, #2 Exhibit B to Discovery Letter Brief - Redacted)(Sipiora, David) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 115 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Discovery Letter Brief - Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2 to Discovery Letter Brief, #3 Exhibit 3 to Discovery Letter Brief)(Schnurer, John) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 114 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay ISO Admin Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 Redacted, #4 Exhibit 1 UNREDACTED)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 113 Declaration of Brian W. Lee in Support of #107 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #107 ) (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 112 Declaration of Brian W. Lee in Support of #108 Declaration in Support, #101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #108 , #101 ) (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 3, 2014 Filing 111 Largan's motion #79 for leave to amend its infringement contentions and its administrative motion #102 to schedule argument -- which the Court will treat as another motion for leave to amend the infringement contentions -- are granted. The parties are directed to proceed as expeditiously as possible in amending the contentions and producing related discovery. If absolutely necessary, the parties may seek an extension of discovery for this limited purpose, but the Court will grant an extension only if it is satisfied that the parties have done everything possible to move this along. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #107 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #102 MOTION for Hearing re #79 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 108 Declaration of Laura Mullendore in Support of #101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #101 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 107 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration L. Mullendore, #2 Proposed Order Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 106 RESPONSE (re #102 MOTION for Hearing re #79 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration L. Mullendore, #3 Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Exhibit 19, #6 Exhibit 20, #7 Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit 22)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 105 The parties may use Powerpoint presentations at the technology tutorial and claim construction hearing pursuant to the parties' stipulation #100 . A copy of the slides must be provided in printed form to the Court at the hearing. They do not need to be filed. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 104 Declaration of Brian W. Lee in Support of #90 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, #93 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #90 , #93 ) (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Its Administrative Motion and Supporting Exhibits (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 102 MOTION for Hearing re #79 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 21 Redacted, #4 Exhibit 22 Redacted, #5 Exhibit 23 Redacted, #6 Exhibit 24 Redacted)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay in Support of Admin Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Admin Motion to Add, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Admin Motion to Add, #5 Exhibit 21 Redacted, #6 Exhibit 21 Unredacted, #7 Errata 22 Redacted, #8 Exhibit 22 Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 23 Redacted, #10 Exhibit 23 Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 24 Redacted, #12 Exhibit 24 Unredacted)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Approval of Powerpoint Presentation at Technology Tutorial Hearing and Claim Construction Hearing filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Connor, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 99 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 06/26/14, before Judge James Donato. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:14 - 2:22. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #95 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/16/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2014. (Related documents(s) #95 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 98 CLERK'S NOTICE Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/16/2014 02:00 PM. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 97 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #79 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 96 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Connor, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Connor, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #93 Declaration in Support, (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 93 Declaration of Laura K. Mullendore in Support of #90 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #90 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 19, 2014 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #90 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 91 REPLY (re #79 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions ) filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 90 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay in Support of Admin. Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Reply Brief - Redacted, #4 Exhibit Reply Brief - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 14 - Sealed, #6 Exhibit 15 - Redacted, #7 Exhibit 15 - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit 16 - Sealed, #9 Exhibit 17 - Redacted, #10 Exhibit 17 - Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 18 - Redacted, #12 Exhibit 18 - Unredacted)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 89 Declaration of Brian W. Lee in Support of #82 Declaration in Support, #78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #82 , #78 ) (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 88 Declaration of Brian W. Lee in Support of #86 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) #86 ) (Lee, Brian) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #86 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 86 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration L. Mullendore, #2 Proposed Order Ex A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 11, 2014 Filing 85 RESPONSE (re #79 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions ) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration M. Bone, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Declaration L. Mullendore, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16)(Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 84 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #79 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #82 Declaration in Support, (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 82 Declaration of Laura K. Mullendore in Support of #78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #78 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 80 EXHIBITS re #78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions Unredacted Motion to Amend filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Motion to Amend)(Related document(s) #78 ) (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 28, 2014 Filing 79 MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 9/11/2014. Replies due by 9/18/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Esterhay ISO Mot to Amend, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 to Esterhay Decl, #4 Exhibit 2 to Esterhay Decl, #5 Exhibit 3 to Esterhay Decl, #6 Exhibit 4 to Esterhay Decl, #7 Exhibit 5 to Esterhay Decl, #8 Exhibit 6 to Esterhay Decl, #9 Exhibit 7 to Esterhay Decl, #10 Exhibit 8 to Esterhay Decl, #11 Exhibit 9 to Esterhay Decl, #12 Exhibit 10 to Esterhay Decl, #13 Exhibit 11 to Esterhay Decl, #14 Exhibit 12 to Esterhay Decl)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 28, 2014 Filing 78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Esterhay ISO of Mot to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #4 Exhibit 1 - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit 2 - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 3 - Unredacted, #9 Exhibit 9 - Redacted, #10 Exhibit 9 - Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 10 - Sealed, #12 Exhibit 11 - Sealed)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
July 22, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings:, Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 10/24/2014. Motions due by 12/5/2014. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/9/2014 09:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 2/17/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Jury Trial set for 2/17/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/2/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #76 Stipulated Scheduling Order. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #73 Stipulation Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
June 27, 2014 Filing 74 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/26/2014 before James Donato (Date Filed: 6/27/2014). (Recording #FTR: 2:14-2:22.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/27/2014)
June 24, 2014 Filing 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 20, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory S. Bishop (Bishop, Gregory) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 20, 2014 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #70 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 1 (Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 70 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 1 filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 1, #4 Unredacted Version of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief and Exhibit 1)(Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 69 Supplemental Brief re #40 Response ( Non Motion ), Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.'s Supplemental Claim Constructon Brief filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #40 ) (Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 68 Supplemental Brief re #36 Brief, Plaintiff Largan Precision Co., Ltd.'s Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 13, 2014 Filing 67 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re #64 Statement, filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd., #65 Status Conference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/12/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 6, 2014 Filing 65 Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 6/6/2014). () (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2014)
June 4, 2014 Filing 64 Statement re #44 Response ( Non Motion ), #40 Response ( Non Motion ), #36 Brief, STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION REGARDING INDEFINITENESS UNDER 35 U.S.C. 112, 2 by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
May 29, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/6/2014 10:00 AM before Hon. James Donato. Parties are instructed to set up the conference call through CourtCall at (866)582-6878. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 05/28/2014. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 62 REDACTION to #36 Brief, Exhibit 5 to Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 61 REDACTION to #40 Response ( Non Motion ), Revised Redacted Exhibit C by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 60 Counter Discovery Letter Brief filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #45 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jdja, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting in part and denying in part #41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jdja, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting in part #37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jdja, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 15, 2014 Filing 56 STIPULATION [Proposed] Order for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order deferring ruling on #53 Discovery Letter Brief entered by Hon. James Donato. Counsel for defendant is directed to file on or before May 20, 2014, a response to plaintiff's discovery dispute letter dated May 13, 2014, not to exceed three pages. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 14, 2014 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Exhibit to Plaintiff's Letter Motion to Compel (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 13, 2014 Filing 53 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Discovery Letter Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 to Discovery Letter Brief)(Schnurer, John) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 13, 2014 Filing 52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Exhibit to Plaintiff's Letter Motion to Compel filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Esterhay, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted version of Exhibit 1)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re #50 Joint Case Management Statement and Stipulated Protective Order. The Court has reviewed the Stipulated Protective Order submitted by the parties with competing language for the Prosecution Bar (Section 8). In the absence of agreement, the Court orders the use of the language in Section 8 (Prosecution Bar) of the Northern District of California's Patent Local Rule 2-2 Interim Model Protective Order. The parties are directed to submit for entry a final Protective Order that complies with this order. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) Signed by Judge James Donato on 05/09/2014. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 50 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Esterhay, John) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Ione Kennedy (Kennedy, Kimberly) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 16, 2014 CASE REASSIGNED to the Honorable James Donato, United States District Judge. All parties must review the reassignment order posted at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/jd-order.pdf and comply with its requirements, including submitting a case management statement. This is a text only docket entry. The reassignment order associated with this notice may be viewed at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/jd-order.pdf Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/16/2014. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 48 Declaration of Laura K. Mullendore in Support of #45 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Mullendore, Laura) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 11, 2014 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #45 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 Filing 46 Proposed Order re #45 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 Filing 45 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle, #2 Exhibit 1 [SEALED], #3 Exhibit 2 [SEALED], #4 Exhibit 3)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 11, 2014 Filing 44 RESPONSE to re #36 Brief, PLAINTIFF LARGAN PRECISION CO., LTD.'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF [REDACTED] by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle in support of Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit 10 [SEALED], #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by John Dudley Esterhay (Esterhay, John) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. re #41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #4 Unredatcted Version of Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit L)(Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 4, 2014 Filing 40 RESPONSE to re #36 Brief, Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 39 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Connor in Support of #37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFF'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Connor, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFF'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFF'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle, #2 Exhibit 1 to Engle Decl., #3 Proposed Order)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 36 Brief PLAINTIFF'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle, #2 Exhibit 1 to Engle Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Engle Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Engle Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Engle Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Engle Decl., SEALED, #7 Exhibit 6 to Engle Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to Engle Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 to Engle Decl., #10 Exhibit 9 to Engle Decl.)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
February 4, 2014 Filing 35 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement (Joint) filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
January 22, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Reid (Reid, Joseph) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
December 12, 2013 Filing 33 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
November 18, 2013 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Largan Precision Co, LTD byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/18/2013) Modified on 11/19/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Judge William H. Orrick denying #26 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 30 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 10/22/2013 before William H. Orrick. Finalized claims to be identified by Friday October 25, 2013. Parties are not to exceed the number of claims and references indicated by the Model Order of the Federal Circuit. If parties are unable to agree as to the appropriate amount of time for expert depositions, the partis are to submit a joint letter outlining the dispute. Parties' proposed schedule adopted. Tutorial Hearing set for 5/23/2014 09:00 AM and Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/30/2014 09:00 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter FTR 2:11-2:15) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 29 REPLY (re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Largan Precision Co., Ltd.'s Indirect Infringement Allegations and Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement of Plaintiff's Direct Infringement Allegations ) (Genius' Reply in Support of It's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Largan's Indirect Infringement Allegations and Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement of Plaintiff's Direct Infringement Allegations) filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 28 RESPONSE (re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Largan Precision Co., Ltd.'s Indirect Infringement Allegations and Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement of Plaintiff's Direct Infringement Allegations ) OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GENIUS ELECTRONIC OPTICAL CO., LTD.S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS AND RULE 12(e) MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Engle, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Engle, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2013) Modified on 10/16/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2013 Filing 26 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Dismiss Plaintiff Largan Precision Co., Ltd.'s Indirect Infringement Allegations and Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement of Plaintiff's Direct Infringement Allegations filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/15/2013. Replies due by 10/22/2013. (Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/1/2013) Modified on 10/2/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William H. Orrick granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Laura K. Mullendore. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William H. Orrick granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Connor. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION and [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Laura K. Mullendore ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7995618.) filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2013) Modified on 9/12/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION and [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Connor ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7995583.) filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2013) Modified on 9/12/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. #15 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference is withdrawn. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/04/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 3, 2013 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 9/3/2013) Modified on 9/4/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2013 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #15 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
September 3, 2013 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
September 3, 2013 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. (Chang, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 16 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Connor in Support of #15 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed byGenius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 9/3/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert John Artuz , David E. Sipiora and Kenneth S. Chang (Artuz, Robert) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re #12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/01/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. (Engle, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE - Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/9/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Largan Precision Co, LTD.. (Schnurer, John) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/4/13. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Largan Precision Co, LTD re #1 Complaint, (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34611086607.). Filed byLargan Precision Co, LTD. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2013: #1 Complaint/ Exhibit A B, #2 Exhibit C D, #3 Exhibit E) (gaS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2019: #4 receipt) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Largan Precision Co, LTD v. Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Alan M Rabinowitz
Represented By: Gregory J. Apgar
Represented By: Brian Woo Lee
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Largan Precision Co, LTD
Represented By: Joseph P. Reid
Represented By: John Dudley Esterhay
Represented By: Ming-Tao Yang
Represented By: Kimberly Ione Kennedy
Represented By: Michael James Engle
Represented By: John P. Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genius Electronic Optical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Gregory S. Bishop
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Connor
Represented By: David E. Sipiora
Represented By: Laura Kathryn Mullendore
Represented By: Robert John Artuz
Represented By: Kristopher Lane Reed
Represented By: Kenneth S. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?