United States of America et al v. Coca-Cola Company, The et al
Plaintiff: |
United States of America and Thomas P. Thrash |
Defendant: |
Coca-Cola Company, The and Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv02551 |
Filed: |
June 6, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
San Francisco |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph C. Spero |
Nature of Suit: |
False Claims Act |
Cause of Action: |
31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 6, 2014 |
Filing
15
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/6/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
|
February 6, 2014 |
Filing
8
ORDER that the United States, having declined to intervene in this action pursuant to the Federal False Claims Act, 31 U.S.C. 3730(b)(4)(B), the Court rules as follows: 1. All current contents of the Court's file in this action shall remain u nder seal and not be made public or served upon the defendants, except for (1) Relator's Complaint; (2) the summons; (3) the scheduling order; and (4) this Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, with (Proposed) Order to Unseal, which are he reby unsealed. 2. The relators shall serve the Complaint upon the defendant. 3. The relator shall serve this Order and the accompanying Joint Notice of Election to Decline Intervention upon the defendant after service of the Complaint. 4. The seal sh all be lifted as to all other matters occuring in this action after the date of this Order. 5. The parties shall serve all pleadings and motions filed in this action, including supporting memoranda, upon the United States, as proved for in 31 U.S.C. 3730(c)(3). The United States may order any deposition transcripts and are entitled to intervene in this action, for good cause, at any time. 6. The parties shall serve all notices of appeal upon the United States. 7. All orders of this Court shall b e sent to the United States. 8. Should the relator or the defendant(s) propose that this action be dismissed, settled, or otherwise discontinued, the Court will provide the United States with notice and an opportunity to be heard before ruling or granting its approval. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/6/14. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?