Re/Max LLC. v. Le et al
Plaintiff: Re/Max LLC.
Defendant: Amax Realty and Lending, Inc. and Min Le
Case Number: 3:2013cv02625
Filed: June 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER VACATING AUGUST 8, 2014 HEARING AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 40 41 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE: REMOVAL OF INFRINGING "AMAX" MARK 40 41 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES 35 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/6/13 is continued to 11/8/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/4/13., Motions terminated: 23 MOTION to Vacate and Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Re/Max LLC.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Judge Illston's Standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/24/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Re/Max LLC. v. Le et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amax Realty and Lending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Min Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Re/Max LLC.
Represented By: Ben M Davidson
Represented By: Nadya Claire Bosch
Represented By: Andrea Lou Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?