Stowers v. WinCo Foods LLC et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Stowers
Defendant: WinCo Foods Foundation, Inc., WinCo Holdings, Inc. and WinCo Foods LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv02631
Filed: June 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re 56 Request for Dismissal with Prejudice, filed by Victoria Stowers. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/27/2014. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Continuance of Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The settlement conference is continued to 11/19/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement conference statements are due November 10, 2014.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Withdrawal of Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/17/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The 04/21/14 Hearing on the motion is VACATED. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/17/14. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Discovery due by 12/1/2014. Motions due by 12/22/2014. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 3/17/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for an estimated 7 days. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/13/2014. Case referred to a Magistrate Judge for a mandatory settlement conference. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stowers v. WinCo Foods LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinCo Foods Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis M. Brown
Represented By: Nicolas Thomas Kelsey
Represented By: Michael Walter Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis M. Brown
Represented By: Nicolas Thomas Kelsey
Represented By: Michael Walter Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinCo Foods LLC
Represented By: Dennis M. Brown
Represented By: Nicolas Thomas Kelsey
Represented By: Michael Walter Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Stowers
Represented By: Robert Joseph Fordiani
Represented By: Lawrence Anthony Organ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?